EP2235678 - EDGE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANALOGIC CORPORATION 8 Centennial Drive Peabody Massachusetts 01960 / US | [2018/47] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states ANALOGIC CORPORATION 8 Centennial Drive Peabody Massachusetts 01960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YILDIZ, Yesna, Oyku 8 Centennial Drive Peabody MA 01960 / US | 02 /
ABRAHAM, Douglas, Q. 8 Centennial Drive Peabody MA 01960 / US | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2018/47] |
Former [2010/40] | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08796953.1 | 31.07.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008US71755 | Priority number, date | US20080062311P | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 62311 P | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009094044 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2235678 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2235678 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30112 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/47] |
Former [2010/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLANKENDETEKTION | [2010/40] | English: | EDGE DETECTION | [2010/40] | French: | DÉTECTION DE CONTOURS | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 05.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2008 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | IE | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | LU | 31.07.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.07.2008 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006245008 (KOHASHI ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [X] - ZHENGYAO BAI ET AL, "An improved ratio edge detector for target detection in sar images", NEURAL NETWORKS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 I NTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NANJING, CHINA DEC. 14-17, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031214), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7702-8, pages 982 - 985, XP010693887 [X] 1-8,20,23,28-30 * sections 2.1, 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNNSP.2003.1280765 | [A] - SINGH M ET AL, "Optimizing image enhancement for screening luggage at airports", COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE FOR HOMELAND SECURITY AND PERSONAL SAFETY, 2005. CIHSPS 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFEREN CE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 31 MARCH-1 APRIL 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050331), ISBN 978-0-7803-9176-5, pages 131 - 136, XP010830679 [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 132, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIHSPS.2005.1500627 | [A] - DE SANTIS A ET AL, "An efficient adaptive algorithm for edge detection based on the likelihood ratio test", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADAPTIVE CONTROL AND SIGNAL PROCESSING WILEY UK, (200205), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0890-6327, pages 289 - 308, XP002545255 [A] * page 296 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ACS.701 | [A] - DING L ET AL, "On the Canny edge detector", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, (20010301), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 721 - 725, XP004321299 [A] * section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(00)00023-6 |