EP2179530 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO JOINTLY SYNCHRONIZE A LEGACY SDARS SIGNAL WITH OVERLAY MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sirius Xm Radio Inc. 1221 Avenue Of The Americas New York, NY 10020 / US | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCARPA, Carl 9 Mershon Ln Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
SCHELL, Edward 6 Okjin Street Jackson, NJ 08527 / US | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08796982.0 | 31.07.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008US71811 | Priority number, date | US20070962780P | 31.07.2007 Original published format: US 962780 P | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009018474 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2179530 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/18, // H04J3/06, H04L7/08, H04L27/34 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
H04L27/183 (EP,US);
H04L27/3488 (EP,US);
H04J7/00 (EP,US);
H04L7/043 (EP,US);
H04L7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | H04L7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEMEINSAMEN SYNCHRONISIERUNG EINES ALT-SDARS-SIGNALS MIT ÜBERLAGERUNGMODULATION | [2010/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO JOINTLY SYNCHRONIZE A LEGACY SDARS SIGNAL WITH OVERLAY MODULATION | [2010/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SYNCHRONISER CONJOINTEMENT UN SIGNAL SDARS PATRIMONIAL AVEC UNE MODULATION DE RECOUVREMENT | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 22.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1528742 (DIRECTV GROUP INC [US]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [A]DE3614638 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 2,4,11,13 * column 2, line 40 - line 44; figures 3,5,6 * * column 4, line 45 - line 52 * | International search | [Y]US2005111580 (WALKER GLENN A [US], et al); | [Y]US3649758 (CLARK JAMES M); | [Y]US2006143677 (WEISS S M [US]) |