EP2176224 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DIAMINOPYRIDINE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RITTER, Joachim, C. 121 Broadbent Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08797020.8 | 01.08.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008US71864 | Priority number, date | US20070953261P | 01.08.2007 Original published format: US 953261 P | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009018502 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2176224 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61, C07D213/73 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C07D213/73 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE SYNTHESE VON DIAMINOPYRIDIN UND VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN | [2010/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DIAMINOPYRIDINE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS | [2010/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE DIAMINOPYRIDINE ET DE COMPOSÉS APPARENTÉS | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 03.08.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]JPS5353662 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO; KOEI CHEMICAL CO) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * example - *; | [AD]DE510432 (SCHERING KAHLBAUM AG) [AD] 1-12 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - CHASE B H ET AL, "Synthesis of 2:6-Diamino-3-arylpyridines", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1953), ISSN 0368-1769, pages 3548 - 3555, XP009106086 [A] 1-12 * page 3553; 5th paragraph; method (B); preparation of 2,6-diamino-3-phenylpyridine (compound XIV) from 2,6-dichloro-3-phenylpyridine (compound XVII) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/jr9530003548 |