EP2182804 - METHODS FOR TREATING DEPENDENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotie Therapies, Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard, Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2011/50] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Synosia Therapeutics, Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOIWODE, Tom c/o Biotie Therapies, Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
MORAN, Mark c/o Biotie Therapies, Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
PICKFORD, Lesley c/o Biotie Therapies, Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2012/02] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
WOIWODE, Tom c/o Synosia Therapeutics Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
02 /
MORAN, Mark c/o Synosia Therapeutics Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
03 /
PICKFORD, Lesley c/o Synosia Therapeutics 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 1200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/21] |
Former [2010/19] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08797300.4 | 06.08.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008US72357 | Priority number, date | US20070935323P | 06.08.2007 Original published format: US 935323 P | US20070956555P | 17.08.2007 Original published format: US 956555 P | US20070960591P | 04.10.2007 Original published format: US 960591 P | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009021055 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2182804 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2182804 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61K31/417, A61K9/08, A61K45/06, A61K31/4164, A61P25/30 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/417 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4164 (US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/12 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | A61K31/415, A61K31/417, A61P25/30 | ||
Former IPC [2010/19] | A01N43/50, A61K31/415 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SUCHT | [2010/19] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING DEPENDENCE | [2010/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE DÉPENDANCE | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 24.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2016 | 07.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17165804.0 / EP3251670 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2008 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | NL | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | IE | 06.08.2017 | MT | 06.08.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.08.2008 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.08.2008 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.08.2008 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2009015248 (SYNOSIA THERAPEUTICS [US], et al) [E] 1,2,4-7,11,12,15 * page , paragraph [0199] * * page 26, paragraph [0281] * * claim 14 *; | [Y] - CUBELLS J F ET AL, "A haplotype at the DBH locus, associated with low plasma dopamine beta-hydroxylase activity, also associates with cocaine-induced paranoia", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (200001), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1359-4184, pages 56 - 63, XP002609337 [Y] 1-27 * abstract * * page 61, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - PETRAKIS ISMENE L ET AL, "Disulfiram treatment for cocaine dependence in methadone-maintained opioid addicts", ADDICTION, (200002), vol. 95, no. 2, ISSN 0965-2140, pages 219 - 228, XP002609338 [Y] 1-27 * abstract * | [Y] - STANLEY WILLIAM C ET AL, "Catecholamine modulatory effects of nepicastat (RS-25560-197), a novel, potent and selective inhibitor of dopamine-beta-hydroxylase", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1997), vol. 121, no. 8, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1803 - 1809, XP002609339 [Y] 1-27 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5593367 (EAVENSON SR JIMMY N [US], et al); | [Y]US5958896 (RENSHAW PERRY F [US], et al); | [Y]US2003040015 (KIM KWANG-SOO [US], et al); | [Y]US2006058336 (NAKANISHI SHIGETADA [JP], et al); | [Y] - NICH ET AL., "Sex differences in cocaine-dependent individuals' response to disulfiram treatment", ADDICTIVE BEHAVIORS, (2004), vol. 29, pages 1123 - 1128, XP008129900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addbeh.2004.03.004 | by applicant | - PETRAKIS ET AL., ADDICTION, (2000), vol. 95, no. 2, pages 219 - 228 | - CUBELLS ET AL., MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (2000), vol. 5, pages 56 - 63 | - STANLEY ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1997), vol. 121, pages 1803 - 1809 | - FEILCHENFELD, N.B.; RICHTER, H.; WADDELL, W.H., ANAL. BIOCHEM: A TIME-RESOLVED ASSAY OF DOPAMINE ?-HYDROXYLASE ACTIVITY UTILIZATING HIGH-PRESSURE LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1982), vol. 122, pages 124 - 128 |