EP2147583 - PLASMA ARC TORCH CUTTING COMPONENT WITH OPTIMIZED WATER COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.03.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hypertherm, Inc. Etna Road P.O. Box 5010 Hanover, NH 03755 / US | [2012/01] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Hypertherm, INC. Etna Road P.O. Box 5010 Hanover, NH 03755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Yong 8 Camp Brook Drive Hanover NH 03755 / US | 02 /
COOK, David, Jonathan 1037 Upper Plain Bradfort VT 05033 / US | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08797423.4 | 07.08.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008US72532 | Priority number, date | US20080028768 | 08.02.2008 Original published format: US 28768 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009099463 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2147583 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147583 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
H05H1/34 (EP,US);
B23K10/00 (EP,US);
H05H1/28 (EP,US);
H05H1/3436 (EP,US);
H05H1/3442 (EP,US);
H05H1/3457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | PLASMALICHTBOGENBRENNER-SCHNEIDEKOMPONENTE MIT OPTIMIERTER WASSERKÜHLUNG | [2010/04] | English: | PLASMA ARC TORCH CUTTING COMPONENT WITH OPTIMIZED WATER COOLING | [2010/04] | French: | COMPOSANT DE CHALUMEAU DE COUPAGE AU PLASMA D'ARC AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT PAR EAU OPTIMISÉ | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/04] | COMPOSANT DE COUPAGE AU CHALUMEAU À ARC PLASMA AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT D'EAU OPTIMISÉ | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
21.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Thermacut, k.s Sokolovská 574 68601 Uherské Hradiste / CZ Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | 02
12.12.2011
21.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
21.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Thermacut, k.s Sokolovská 574 68601 Uherské Hradiste / CZ Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | ||
02
12.12.2011
21.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2020/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
21.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Holma AG Laser & Plasma Consumables Rietbergstrasse 49 9403 Goldach / CH Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | ||
02
12.12.2011
21.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2012/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
Holma AG Laser & Plasma Consumables Rietbergstrasse 49 9403 Goldach / CH Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | ||
02
12.12.2011
L'AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 14.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.08.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.08.2012 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2012 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.12.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/16] | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 01.04.2015 | Appeal received No. T0597/15 | 17.12.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 19.03.2015 | Appeal received No. T0597/15 | 17.12.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 17.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HR | 06.04.2011 | HU | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | MT | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | NO | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | IE | 07.08.2011 | LU | 07.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | FR | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | GB | 07.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | SK | 07.08.2020 | [2021/28] |
Former [2018/17] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
HU | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 07.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/45] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
HU | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 07.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 07.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 07.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6320156 (YAMAGUCHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7,12-15,17,20-24 * column 12, line 12 - line 19 * * column 13, line 61 - column 14, line 10 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2005133484 (DELZENNE MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1,24* figure 4b *; | [A]US2007045245 (BRANDT AARON D [US], et al) [A] 1,7,12,17,20-22,24 * paragraph [0065]; figure 11 *; | [E]EP2034805 (THERMAL DYNAMICS CORP [US]) [E] 24 * figure 2 * |