EP2179533 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURE REMOTE TRANSFER OF MASTER KEY FOR AUTOMATED TELLER BANKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Triton Systems of Delaware, LLC 21405 B Street Long Beach, MS 39560 / US | [2014/03] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Triton ATMs, LLC The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Centre 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states Delaware Capital Formation, Inc. 501 Silverside Road Suite 5 Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Henry 2358 Fifth Street Oceanside, New York 11572 / US | 02 /
CORDEIRO, Daryll 296 Alaska Avenue NE Atlanta, Georgia 30312 / US | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, Matthew David, et al Bryers Intellectual Property Limited Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Greenwood, Matthew David, et al Bryers LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | ||
Former [2010/17] | Greenwood, Matthew David, et al Bryer, Shelley, John Amor, Greenwood LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08797829.2 | 13.08.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008US73074 | Priority number, date | US20070955716P | 14.08.2007 Original published format: US 955716 P | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009023747 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2179533 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2179533 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/32, G06Q20/38 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H04L9/0825 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3829 (EP,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | ||
Former IPC [2010/17] | H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2010/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SICHEREN FERNÜBERTRAGUNG EINES MASTER-SCHLÜSSELS FÜR EINE AUTOMATISIERTE BANKSCHALTERMASCHINE | [2010/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURE REMOTE TRANSFER OF MASTER KEY FOR AUTOMATED TELLER BANKING MACHINE | [2010/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LE TRANSFERT ÉLOIGNÉ SÉCURISÉ D'UNE CLÉ MAÎTRESSE POUR UNE MACHINE BANCAIRE À CAISSE AUTOMATISÉE | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 16.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2008 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BE | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | PT | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 13.08.2008 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PT | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 13.08.2008 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.08.2008 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7159114 (ZAJKOWSKI TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 2 * * column 8, line 21 - line 29 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 5 * * column 9, line 21 - line 47 * * column 10, line 6 - line 25 * * column 11, line 10 - line 27 * * column 12, line 7 - line 16 * * column 12, line 52 - column 13, line 27 * * column 14, line 17 - line 34 * * column 17, line 5 - line 23 * * column 18, line 17 - line 24 * * column 19, line 3 - line 33 *; | [X]US7110986 (ZAJKOWSKI TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 19 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 2 * * column 8, line 21 - line 29 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 5 * * column 9, line 21 - line 47 * * column 10, line 6 - line 25 * * column 11, line 10 - line 27 * * column 12, line 7 - line 16 * * column 12, line 52 - column 13, line 27 * * column 14, line 17 - line 34 * * column 17, line 5 - line 23 * * column 18, line 17 - line 23 * * column 19, line 3 - line 33 *; | [A]US5517567 (EPSTEIN PHILIP [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, line 55 - column 7, line 40 *; | [A]US4933971 (BESTOCK RALPH R [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 6 - line 47 * | [A] - "Chapter 10: Identification and Entity Authentication ED - Menezes A J; Van Oorschot P C; Vanstone S A", ISBN 978-0-8493-8523-0, (19961001), HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY; [CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICES AND ITS APPLICATIONS], CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICS AND ITS APPLICATIONS, BOCA RATON, FL, US, PAGE(S) 385 - 424, URL: http://www.cacr.math.uwaterloo.ca/hac/, XP001525010 [A] 1-16 * Section 10.3.3 * | International search | [X]US7159114 (ZAJKOWSKI TIMOTHY [US], et al); | [A]US2004008846 (MEDVINSKY ALEXANDER [US]); | [A]US7229009 (PARSONS DONALD [US], et al) |