EP2191101 - DRILL IN SAND CONTROL LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P. O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARD, Bennett 4542 Windy Hollow Drive Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Michael, H. 6230 Clear Canyon Drive Katy, TX 77450 / US | 03 /
ROSENBLATT, Steve 3600 Montrose Blvd, No. 502 Houston, TX 77006 / US | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2015/11] |
Former [2010/22] | Hano, Christian v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08798141.1 | 19.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008US73540 | Priority number, date | US20070845893 | 28.08.2007 Original published format: US 845893 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009032517 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191101 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191101 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/00, E21B7/20, E21B43/10, E21B43/08 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
E21B7/20 (EP,US);
E21B43/08 (EP,US);
E21B43/10 (EP,US);
E21B43/108 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | E21B43/34, E21B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | BOHRLINER MIT SANDKONTROLLE | [2015/11] | English: | DRILL IN SAND CONTROL LINER | [2010/22] | French: | COLONNE PERDUE POUR FORAGE AVEC CONTRÔLE À SABLE | [2015/11] |
Former [2010/22] | SANDBOHRKONTROLLHÜLSE | ||
Former [2010/22] | COLONNE PERDUE À CONTRÔLE POUR FORAGE DANS DU SABLE | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 27.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2008 | AT | 11.03.2015 | BE | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MT | 11.03.2015 | NL | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | TR | 11.03.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | GB | 19.08.2015 | IE | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LU | 19.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | NO | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
GB | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
GB | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
GB | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
GB | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003226663 (KRUEGER SVEN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0038]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2-19; | [I]US2771275 (ORTLOFF JOHN E) [I] 1,4,6,8 * figures 1-12; claim 1 *; | [I]US2005121232 (RUDD WAYNE [GB], et al) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0055] - [0057]; figures 1-9 *; | [XI]WO2007009247 (TESCO CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 2-19; | [I]US6431292 (MOCIVNIK JOSEF [AT], et al) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0038] - [0042]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US6877553 (CAMERON JOHN A M [GB]) [A] 1-19 * See the abstract and Figures 1-4. *; | [A]US6543545 (CHATTERJI JITEN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See the abstract and Figures 1-4B. *; | [A]US5355948 (SPARLIN DERRY D [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See the abstract and Figures 2-7. *; | [A]US4401158 (SPENCER JACK D [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See the abstract and Figures 1a-1c. *; | [A]US5330003 (BULLICK ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-19 * See the abstract and Figure 3. * | by applicant | US2003226663 | US2771275 | WO2007009247 |