EP2201194 - A FORMWORK CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hal Brackets Pty Ltd 15 Patrick Street Aitkenvale, QLD 4814 / AU | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REILLY, Matthew Kent c/- 15 Patrick Street Aitkenvale, Queensland 4814 / AU | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Gemmell, Peter Alan Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | ||
Former [2013/10] | Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | ||
Former [2010/26] | Long, Edward Anthony Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08799996.7 | 11.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008AU01355 | Priority number, date | AU20070216794 | 13.09.2007 Original published format: AU 2007216794 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009033225 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201194 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04G17/14 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
E04G17/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | SCHALUNGSKLEMME | [2010/26] | English: | A FORMWORK CLAMP | [2010/26] | French: | BRIDE DE COFFRAGE | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2511584 (HILL HAYDEN C) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US3006592 (DAVIS JR THOMAS J) [X] 1-4,9,11,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,12 [I] 5,6,10; | [A]CA1329492 (LUBINSKI RONALD [CA]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004018777 (LANKA RICHARD I [US]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]DE202006019268U (ALTRAD BAUMANN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7,8,12 * page 3, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 29; figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US2511584 (HILL HAYDEN C); | [Y]US6065254 (LANKA RICHARD [US]); | [X]US2006201743 (DELL ERBA PETER H [US], et al); | [Y]US2006207215 (BRUNO STEPHEN M [US]) | by applicant | US3006592 |