EP2200638 - COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TRANSFECTION OF CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/26] | A METHOD OF TRANSFECTION AND COMPOSITIONS THEREFOR | ||
[2015/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Melbourne Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, David Charles 74 Woodville Street North Balwyn Victoria 3104 / AU | 02 /
ZENG, Weiguang 46 Mercantile Parade Kensington Victoria 3031 / AU | 03 /
CHUA, Brendon Yew Loong 2/21-23 Bamfield Road Heidelberg Heights Victoria 3081 / AU | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08800135.9 | 09.10.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008AU01501 | Priority number, date | AU20070905530 | 09.10.2007 Original published format: AU 2007905530 | AU20070905536 | 09.10.2007 Original published format: AU 2007905536 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009046498 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2200638 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2200638 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K1/107, C12N15/87 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K1/1075 (EP,US);
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6018 (EP,US);
A61K2039/622 (EP,US);
C12N2810/855 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DIE TRANSFEKTION VON ZELLEN | [2015/19] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TRANSFECTION OF CELLS | [2015/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LA TRANSFECTION DES CELLULES | [2015/19] |
Former [2010/26] | TRANSFEKTIONSVERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2010/26] | A METHOD OF TRANSFECTION AND COMPOSITIONS THEREFOR | ||
Former [2010/26] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFECTION ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIÉES | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 09.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 13.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2008 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | LU | 09.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 09.10.2008 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 09.10.2008 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.10.2008 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.10.2008 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005070959 (VIEVAX CORP [US], et al); | [X]EP1666056 (BESTEWIL HOLDING BV [NL]); | [X]WO2007103322 (VAXINNATE CORP [US], et al); | Examination | WO2004014956 |