EP2326890 - PERFORATED TRANSPARENT GLAZING FOR HEAT RECOVERY AND SOLAR AIR HEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AÉRONERGIE INC. 1514 J-B Michaud (SDED) Drummondville, QC J2C 2Z5 / CA | [2016/14] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Solutions Énergétiques Énerconcept Inc. 42 Rue Principale Ouest, bureau 201 Magog, QC J1X 2A5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACHON, Christian 201, 42 rue Principale Ouest Magog, Québec J1X 2A5 / CA | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08800292.8 | 05.09.2008 | [2011/22] | WO2008CA01588 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010025537 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2326890 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/20, F24J2/05, F24J2/50, // F24J2/04, F24J2/28 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
F24S20/67 (EP);
F24S20/66 (EP,US);
F24S10/50 (EP);
F24S10/80 (EP,US);
F24S80/56 (EP,US);
F24S2020/18 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | F24J2/20, F24J2/05, F24J2/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | PERFORIERTE DURCHSICHTIGE VERGLASUNG FÜR WÄRMEGEWINNUNG UND SOLARLUFTHEIZUNG | [2011/22] | English: | PERFORATED TRANSPARENT GLAZING FOR HEAT RECOVERY AND SOLAR AIR HEATING | [2011/22] | French: | VITRAGE TRANSPARENT PERFORE POUR RECUPERATION DE CHALEUR ET CHAUFFAGE D'AIR SOLAIRE | [2011/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 23.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3412728 (THOMASON HARRY E) [X] 1-3,5-11,13,14 * column 1, line 50 - line 72; figure 1 * * column 2, line 12 - line 39 * [Y] 4,12,15; | [XY]SU932164 (UNIV TURKMENSK [SU], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * column 2, line 1 - line 24; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [Y]GB2214710 (UNIV OPEN [GB]) [Y] 4,12,15* claim 8 *; | [XY]US2008139106 (VACHON CHRISTIAN [CA]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0020]; figure 3 * [Y] 4 | International search | [X]US5081982 (MACKENZIE JOHN A [CA]); | [X]US5692491 (CHRISTENSEN CRAIG B [US], et al); | [X]WO03048655 (CHRISTENSEN HANS JOERGEN [DK]); | [X]US2008139106 (VACHON CHRISTIAN [CA]); | [X] - "National Renewable Energy Laboratory (Produced for the US Department of Energy).", TRANSPIRED AIR COLLECTORS., (200606), URL: http://www.scribd.com/full/2385794?access key=key-28hb8m87pk2m3jt2ukm4, (20090505), XP008144312 |