EP2206053 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING PHYSIOLOGICAL PARAMETER VARIABILITY OVER TIME FOR ONE OR MORE ORGANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ottawa Hospital Research Institute 725 Parkdale Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9 / CA | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEELY, Andrew J.E 94 Cameron Avenue Ottawa Ontario K1S 0X1 / CA | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2010/28] | Rooney, John-Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08800404.9 | 01.10.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008CA01720 | Priority number, date | US20070977179P | 03.10.2007 Original published format: US 977179 P | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009043144 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2206053 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, A61B5/00, A61G99/00, G01D1/16, G01D7/00, G06F17/18, G06F19/00 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/417 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/024 (EP,US);
A61B5/026 (EP,US);
A61B5/08 (EP,US);
A61B5/082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER VARIABILITÄT PHYSIOLOGISCHER PARAMETER ÜBER DIE ZEIT HINWEG FÜR EINES ODER MEHRERE ORGANE | [2010/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING PHYSIOLOGICAL PARAMETER VARIABILITY OVER TIME FOR ONE OR MORE ORGANS | [2010/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA VARIABILITÉ DANS LE TEMPS D'UN PARAMÈTRE PHYSIOLOGIQUE POUR UN OU PLUSIEURS ORGANES | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 10.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2017 | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 15.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003117296 (SEELY ANDREW J E [CA]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2006122474 (TELLER ERIC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1, 7-11 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0054] * * paragraphs [0059] , [0 64] , [0 71] * * paragraphs [0077] , [ 102] , [ 109] * | International search | [A]CA2408502 (BOSTON MED TECH INC [US]); | [A]CA2418003 (SEELY ANDREW J E [CA]); | [A]US2004111033 (OUNG HARRY [US], et al); | [AP]WO2007149856 (VIVOMETRICS INC [US], et al); | [AP]CA2627386 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) | by applicant | US7038595 | US2006122474 |