EP2191484 - ELECTRICAL WIRE SPRING CONTACT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road 4 Dublin / IE | [2018/11] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Eaton Industries GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Eaton Industies GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNDT, Karl, Heinz Bonner Str. 64 53859 Niederkassel / DE | 02 /
FREYERMUTH, Thomas Hilberather Str. 74 53505 Kalenborn / DE | 03 /
WIESE, Artur Unter der Windmühle 63 53332 Bornheim / DE | [2010/22] | Application number, filing date | 08801656.3 | 21.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008EP06880 | Priority number, date | DE20071045432 | 22.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007045432 | [2010/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009036859 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191484 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191484 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/24, H01H11/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
H01H1/245 (EP);
H01H11/0012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES DRAHTFEDERKONTAKTSYSTEM | [2010/22] | English: | ELECTRICAL WIRE SPRING CONTACT SYSTEM | [2010/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ÉLECTRIQUE DE CONTACT À RESSORT EN FIL | [2017/16] |
Former [2010/22] | SYSTYÈME ÉLECTRIQUE DE CONTACT À RESSORT EN FIL | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2008 | CY | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MT | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | AT | 21.08.2018 | IE | 21.08.2018 | LU | 21.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.08.2008 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.08.2018 | ||
IE | 21.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.08.2008 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 21.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/42] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 22.11.2017 | |
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 22.11.2017 | |
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6521852 (NI YU-TING [TW]) [X] 1,3-12 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [YA]US4119821 (OVERTON ARTHUR WAYNE) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,3-12; | [X]DE2937925 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3548137 (FARRELL GUY M ET AL) [A] 2 * column 3, lines 65-70 * |