EP2193022 - SHEET MATERIAL FOR THE BUILDING SECTOR AND COMPOSITE SHEET-MATERIAL ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, MT | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EWALD DÖRKEN AG Wetterstrasse 58 58313 Herdecke / DE | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖER, Jörn In der Schlage 8 58313 Herdecke / DE | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/23] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08802559.8 | 24.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008EP08082 | Priority number, date | DE20071046175 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007046175 | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009043515 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2193022 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193022 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/02, E04B1/66 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
E04B7/00 (US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
E04B1/665 (EP,US);
B32B2262/065 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7163 (EP,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,US);
E04B1/625 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | FOLIE FÜR DEN BAUBEREICH UND FOLIENVERBUND | [2010/23] | English: | SHEET MATERIAL FOR THE BUILDING SECTOR AND COMPOSITE SHEET-MATERIAL ARRANGEMENT | [2010/23] | French: | FILM POUR LE SECTEUR DE LA CONSTRUCTION ET FILM COMPOSITE | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 08.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | MT | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2016/25] | BG | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE29611626U (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1-23 * page 6, lines 5-13 *; | [Y]WO0216468 (KHASHOGGI E IND [US]) [Y] 1-23 * page 2, line 15 * * page 2, lines 1,2 *; | [Y]DE10111319 (OEKOLOGISCHE BAUSYSTEME B I MO [DE]) [Y] 1-23 * claims 1-4 *; | [Y]DE10231769 (ORBITA FILM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] *; | [Y]DE10239985 (OEKOLOGISCHE BAUSYSTEME B I MO [DE]) [Y] 1-23 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004103603 (KUNZEL HARTWIG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0029] *; | [A]EP1834762 (TEC JOINT AG [CH]) [A] 1* paragraph [0010] * |