EP2176167 - COMPOSITE FOR FUEL CELL MEMBRANE BASED ON ORGANOMODIFIED INORGANIC PARTICLES AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/11] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEPCERON, Frédérick 130 rue Victor Hugo F-37000 Tours / FR | 02 /
GALIANO, Hervé 9, rue Claudie Deshayes F-37700 LA VILLE AUX DAMES FRANCE / FR | 03 /
TASSIN, Jean-François 15 route de la Countise F-72360 Change / FR | [2010/26] |
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
NIEPCERON, Frédérick 130 rue Victor Hugo F-37000 Tours / FR | ||
02 /
GALIANO, Hervé 13 rue de Bordeaux F-37360 Joue Les Tours / FR | |||
03 /
TASSIN, Jean-François 15 route de la Countise F-72360 Change / FR | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2010/16] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08802939.2 | 20.06.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008EP57902 | Priority number, date | FR20070055957 | 22.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0755957 | [2010/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009000779 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176167 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176167 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y30/00, C09C1/36, C09C1/40, C08J3/20, C08J3/205, C09C3/10, C09C1/30, C08J3/215, H01M8/10, H01M8/1023, H01M8/1034, H01M8/1039, H01M8/1044, H01M8/1051, H01M8/106, H01M8/1072 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
C08J3/201 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08F292/00 (EP,US);
C08G83/001 (EP,US);
C08J3/2056 (EP,US);
C08J3/215 (EP,US);
C08J5/2281 (EP,US);
C09C1/3072 (EP,US);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
C09C1/309 (EP,US);
C09C1/3676 (EP,US);
C09C1/407 (EP,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1034 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1044 (EP,US);
H01M8/1051 (EP,US);
H01M8/106 (EP,US);
H01M8/1072 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0065 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0088 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F292/00, C08F212/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/16] | C01B33/12, C01B33/18, C01B39/02, C01G23/04, C01G25/02, C08J5/22, C08K9/08, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2010/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTOFF FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLENMEMBRAN AUF BASIS ORGANOMODIFIZIERTER ANORGANISCHER PARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2010/16] | English: | COMPOSITE FOR FUEL CELL MEMBRANE BASED ON ORGANOMODIFIED INORGANIC PARTICLES AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME | [2010/16] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSITE POUR MEMBRANE DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE A BASE DE PARTICULES INORGANIQUES ORGANOMODIFIEES ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CEUX-CI | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2008 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IE | 20.06.2018 | LU | 20.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0023510 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10,17-19,22-24 * page 3, line 21 - page 9, line 23 * [Y] 9,11-16,20,21; | [Y]WO2005101552 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 9,11-16,20,21 * page 6, line 24 - page 9, line 19 ** page 10, line 17 - page 17, line 28 * |