EP2185677 - DETERGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.04.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2018 | Change: Date of receipt of notice of appeal | 27.06.2018 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIPFEL, Johannes Paul-Gerhardt-Strasse 2 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
WARKOTSCH, Nadine Haus-Endt-Strasse 26 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
KESSLER, Arnd Humboldtstrasse 53 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 04 /
NITSCH, Christian Otto-Hahn-Str. 185 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
MÜLLER, Sven Greifswalderstr. 24 47269 Duisburg / DE | 06 /
BELLOMI, Luca Eichenwand 42 40627 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/20] | Application number, filing date | 08803452.5 | 01.09.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008EP61469 | Priority number, date | DE20071042907 | 10.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007042907 | [2010/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009033973 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185677 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2185677 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/36, C11D3/37 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C11D3/361 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/36 (EP,US);
C11D3/378 (EP,KR,US);
C11D2111/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2010/20] | English: | DETERGENTS | [2010/20] | French: | DÉTERGENTS | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 31.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2012
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser N.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Gill-Carey, Michael Reckitt Benckiser, Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2012
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser N.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Gill Carey, Michael Reckitt Benckiser, Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Damson Lane Hull HU8 7 DS / GB | 23.05.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.08.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.12.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.03.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.03.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/22] | Appeal following opposition | 09.02.2015 | Appeal received | 21.04.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.01.2015 | Appeal received No. T0232/15 | 14.04.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.03.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 12.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HR | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | MT | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | NO | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2013/29] |
Former [2012/13] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
NO | 29.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4321429 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]US5763378 (PAINTER JEFFREY D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * examples V,VI,VII *; | [A]US5801137 (ADDISON MICHAEL CROMBIE [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-17 *; | [A]US6225277 (GORDON NEIL JAMES [BE]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]WO0220708 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * table 3 *; | [A]DE10133137 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0092] , [0111]; claims 1-19 *; | [A]US2004127377 (RODRIGUES KLEIN A [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023]; claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO2006029806 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-4 *; | [PA]WO2008095561 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [PA] 1-14* claims 1-12 * |