EP2192967 - SELF-CLEANING FILTRATION MACHINE WITH ROTARY DRUM FILTER FOR CONTAMINATED LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Losma S.p.a. Via E. Fermi 16 24035 Curno / IT | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLA, Carlo Via Lessona 31 I-10074 Lanzo Torinese / IT | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/23] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08803644.7 | 04.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008EP61674 | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01789 | 17.09.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071789 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009037122 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2192967 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2192967 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D33/073, B01D33/50 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B01D35/06 (EP,US);
B01D33/073 (EP,US);
B01D33/463 (EP);
B01D33/50 (EP);
B01D33/801 (EP);
B01D33/807 (EP);
B01D2201/204 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01D33/073, B01D33/463, B01D33/50, B01D33/801, B01D33/807 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2010/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTREINIGUNGSFILTRATIONSMASCHINE MIT DREHTROMMELFILTER FÜR VERUNREINIGTE FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2010/23] | English: | SELF-CLEANING FILTRATION MACHINE WITH ROTARY DRUM FILTER FOR CONTAMINATED LIQUIDS | [2010/23] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE FILTRATION AUTONETTOYANT ÉQUIPÉ D'UN FILTRE À TAMBOUR ROTATIF POUR LIQUIDES POLLUÉS | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2008 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | IE | 04.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.09.2008 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.09.2008 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4261822 (RICHARDSON HARRY L) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]EP0463538 (PADOVAN SNC DI GIORGIO MARIO E [IT]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0566908 (KUEMMERLE BRUNO [DE]) [X] 1-17 * column 17, line 36 - column 18 * * figure - *; | [A]US5356532 (WILKINS THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2302818 (VIALS MICHAEL JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0943366 (NAGAOKA TADAYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-17 * figure 4 *; | [X]US6336561 (KOSSIK JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | GB1443432 | by applicant | EP0463538 | EP0943366 | US6336561 |