EP2283620 - PARTITIONING ENTITY AND METHOD FOR PARTITIONING CAPACITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/45] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUDWIG, Reiner Bergstrasse 18 52393 Hürtgenwald / DE | 02 /
EKSTRÖM, Hannes Primusgatan 91 S-112 67 Stockholm / SE | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/45] |
Former [2011/07] | Tonscheidt, Andreas, et al Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 08803648.8 | 04.09.2008 | [2011/07] | WO2008EP61678 | Priority number, date | US20080054508P | 20.05.2008 Original published format: US 54508 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141016 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2283620 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2283620 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L12/801, H04L12/803, H04L12/861, H04L12/911, H04W28/02, // H04L12/24 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04W28/0268 (EP,US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L47/828 (EP,US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04W72/535 (EP,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/45] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PARTITIONIERUNGSENTITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR KAPAZITÄTSPARTITIONIERUNG | [2011/07] | English: | PARTITIONING ENTITY AND METHOD FOR PARTITIONING CAPACITY | [2011/07] | French: | ENTITÉ DE PARTITIONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PARTITIONNEMENT DE CAPACITÉ | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2008 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | IT | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 08.11.2017 | |
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003007453 (OGIER RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A] - KITTI WONGTHAVARAWAT, AURA GANZ, "Packet scheduling for QoS support in IEEE 802.16 broadband wireless access systems", INTERNET ARTICLE, (2003), pages 81 - 96, URL: http://www3.interscience.wiley.com/cgi-bin/fulltext/103019965/PDFSTART, (20090220), XP002516156 [A] 3-13 * page 86, line 19 - page 87, line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/DAC.581 | Examination | US2002167957 | WO2008023644 | EP2056616 | by applicant | US2003007453 |