EP2215515 - SPECTACLES WITH CONTIGUOUS LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logo 12 rue Voltaire 39400 Morez / FR | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACQUEMIN, Didier C/O NOVAGRAAF TECHNOLOGIES 25A rue Proudhon F-25000 Besancon / FR | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Brungard, Yves Francois Novagraaf Technologies 25A, rue Proudhon 25000 Besançon / FR | Application number, filing date | 08803872.4 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP61904 | Priority number, date | FR20070008346 | 29.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0708346 | [2010/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068334 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215515 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02C1/04 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
G02C1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | BRILLE MIT ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDEN LINSEN | [2010/32] | English: | SPECTACLES WITH CONTIGUOUS LENSES | [2010/32] | French: | LUNETTES DU TYPE A VERRES JOINTIFS | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 22.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2487084 (AYACHE CHARLES [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 38 - page 5, line 10; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4762406 (STEINER WALTER [CH]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0999466 (HEMARIS GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO0233475 (SAFILO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-8* page 3, line 3 - page 7, line 31; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1857856 (BOUVRET SOC NOUVELLE SARL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-14C * |