EP2205778 - METHOD OF OBTAINING A YELLOW GOLD ALLOY COATING BY ELECTROPLATING WITHOUT THE USE OF TOXIC METALS OR METALLOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G. Aliprandini Chemin de Bézaley 45 1247 Asnières / CH | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALIPRANDINI, Giuseppe Ch. de Bézaley 45 CH-1247 Anières / CH | 02 /
CAILLAUD, Michel 19 rue de la Forêt F-25130 Villers-le-lac / FR | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 08804009.2 | 11.09.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008EP62042 | Priority number, date | CH20070001494 | 21.09.2007 Original published format: CH 14942007 | [2010/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009037180 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2205778 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2205778 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/62 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
C25D3/62 (EP,US);
C25D3/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ÜBERZUGS AUS GELBER GOLDLEGIERUNG DURCH GALVANISIEREN OHNE VERWENDUNG VON TOXISCHEN METALLEN ODER METALLOIDEN | [2010/28] | English: | METHOD OF OBTAINING A YELLOW GOLD ALLOY COATING BY ELECTROPLATING WITHOUT THE USE OF TOXIC METALS OR METALLOIDS | [2010/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION D'UN DÉPÔT D'ALLIAGE D'OR JAUNE PAR GALVANOPLASTIE SANS UTILISATION DE MÉTAUX OU MÉTALLOÏDES TOXIQUES | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 07.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2012 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2011
29.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Umicore Galvanotechnik GmbH Klarenbergstrasse 53-79 73525 Schwäbisch-Gmünd / DE Opponent's representative Retzow, Stefan, et al, et al Umicore AG & Co. KG Patente Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2012/01] | 10.01.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.04.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2013 | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.09.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.09.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HR | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IE | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | MT | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | NO | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | LU | 11.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2018/17] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
HU | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 11.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 11.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 23.02.2011 | |
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH455434 (WERNER FLUEHMANN GALVANISCHE A [CH]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, lines 22-32 * * claims 1,6,9 *; | [A]GB1134615 (TECHNIC) [A] 1-16 * example III * * claims 1,4,7,8 *; | [A]GB1156186 (SEL REX CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * example 11 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE1696087 (SEL REX CORP) [A] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 *; | [A]GB1294601 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 1, lines 12-17 * * page 1, lines 28-52 * * claims 1,2,16,19-21 *; | [A]FR2405312 (OXY METAL INDUSTRIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, lines 7-18 * * examples 1-6 *; | [A]US4168214 (FLETCHER AUGUSTUS, et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract ** claims 1,5 *; | [A]EP0384679 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, lines 20-29 * | other | JP2001198693 |