EP2201081 - ADDITIVES FOR WATER-BASED DRILLING FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emery Oleochemicals GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTFECHTEL, Alfred Menzelweg 74 40724 Hilden / DE | 02 /
MÄKER, Diana Schwarzbachstr. 70 40822 Mettmann / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Heinz Sperberstr. 5 40789 Monheim / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
WESTFECHTEL, Alfred Menzelweg 74 40724 Hilden / DE | ||
02 /
MÄKER, Diana Brandenburgerallee 8A 40789 Monheim / DE | |||
03 /
MÜLLER, Heinz Sperberstr. 5 40789 Monheim / DE | Representative(s) | Kinkeldey, Daniela, et al Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/19] | Kinkeldey, Daniela, et al Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Herzog, Martin Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Immermannstrasse 59 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08804161.1 | 12.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP62200 | Priority number, date | EP20070018086 | 14.09.2007 Original published format: EP 07018086 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009037212 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201081 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201081 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/035, C09K8/22, C09K8/28 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
C09K8/035 (EP,US);
C09K8/22 (EP,US);
C09K8/28 (EP,US);
Y10S507/904 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | C09K8/28, C09K8/03, C09K8/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | ADDITIVE FÜR WASSERBASIERTE BOHRSPÜLMITTEL | [2010/26] | English: | ADDITIVES FOR WATER-BASED DRILLING FLUIDS | [2010/26] | French: | ADDITIFS POUR FLUIDES DE FORAGE À BASE D'EAU | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 02.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2008 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | ES | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | AT | 12.09.2014 | IE | 12.09.2014 | LU | 12.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | FR | 13.10.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.09.2008 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 12.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 12.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 12.09.2014 | ||
IE | 12.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 12.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 12.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 12.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3622826 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,11-13 * claims 1,9,14 * [Y] 4-7,9-10; | [XY]EP0579159 (SOLVAY FLUOR & DERIVATE [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-13 * abstract * * the whole document * * claims 18,19 * [Y] 4-5,12; | [XY]DE4226174 (SOLVAY FLUOR & DERIVATE [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8-12 * abstract * * claims 1,8,24,28 * * the whole document * [Y] 4-5,7,13; | [Y]DE19852971 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 63 - page 3, line 32 *; | [Y]WO2007068404 (COGNIS OLEOCHEMICALS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 ** the whole document * | Examination | EP1518900 | EP1704846 | by applicant | DE3622826 | EP0579159 | DE4226174 | DE19647598 | DE19852971 | WO2007068404 | DE102005060549 |