EP2203454 - TRICYCLIC HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. Waarderweg 39 2031 BN Haarlem / NL | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Waarderweg 39 2031 BN Haarlem / NL | ||
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Organon BioSciences Nederland B.V. Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states MSD Oss B.V. Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | ||
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states N.V. Organon Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROVE, Simon James Anthony New Edinburgh Road Lanarkshire Newhouse Central Scotland ML1 5SH / GB | 02 /
KIYOI, Takao New Edinburgh Road Lanarkshire Newhouse Central Scotland ML1 5SH / GB | 03 /
MISTRY, Ashvinkumar Dhirubhai New Edinburg Road Lanarkshire Newhouse Central Scotland ML1 5SH / GB | 04 /
RAY, Peter, Christopher New Edinburgh Road Lanarkshire Central Scotland ML1 5SH / GB | 05 /
WISHART, Grant New Edinburgh Road Lanarkshire Newhouse Central Scotland ML1 5SH / GB | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Jaap, David Robert Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Jaap, David Robert Merck & Co., Inc. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2010/27] | Jaap, David Robert, et al P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 08804190.0 | 15.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008EP62229 | Priority number, date | EP20070116561 | 17.09.2007 Original published format: EP 07116561 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009037220 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203454 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/052, A61K31/40, A61P25/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
C07D491/052 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Extension states | AL | 19.04.2010 | BA | 19.04.2010 | MK | 19.04.2010 | RS | 19.04.2010 | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE | [2010/27] | English: | TRICYCLIC HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES | [2010/27] | French: | DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES TRICYCLIQUES | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 25.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4132709 (SANTROCH GEORGE, et al) [DX] 1-16 * column 1, line 13 - line 24 * * column 12 - column 19; examples 1-16 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0222703 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 1 - line 58 * * page 10 - page 23; examples 1-40 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9006927 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 15 * * page 30 - page 71; examples 1-92 * * claim 1 ** claim 3 *; | [Y]EP0410535 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 1 - line 42 * * page 10 - page 19; examples 1-24 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0691342 (ADIR [FR]) [Y] 1-16 * page 4, line 41 - page 5, line 29 * * page 14 - page 20; examples 1-17 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | US4132709 | US4132710 | EP0050387 | EP0222703 | EP0691342 | - DUNLOP J, CNS DRUG REVIEWS, (2006), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 167 - 177 | - SIUCIAK J. A, NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2007), vol. 52, pages 279 - 290 | - WACKER D. A ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 1365 - 1379 | - LOOZEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL NETHERLANDS CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1982), vol. 101-9 |