EP2205842 - COMPRESSOR SEQUENCE VALVE AND REGISTER CHARGING UNIT HAVING SUCH COMPRESSOR SEQUENCE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGT, Guenther Gewerbering 15 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
HAMMER, Uwe Obere Tiefenbachstr. 20 83734 Hausham / DE | [2010/28] | Application number, filing date | 08804726.1 | 25.09.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008EP62828 | Priority number, date | DE20071050986 | 25.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007050986 | [2010/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009053206 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2205842 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2205842 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/007 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
F02B37/007 (EP);
F02B37/001 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | VERDICHTERZUSCHALTVENTIL UND REGISTERAUFLADEEINRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN VERDICHTERZUSCHALTVENTIL | [2010/28] | English: | COMPRESSOR SEQUENCE VALVE AND REGISTER CHARGING UNIT HAVING SUCH COMPRESSOR SEQUENCE VALVE | [2010/28] | French: | SOUPAPE DE BRANCHEMENT DE COMPRESSEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE SURALIMENTATION À REGISTRE DOTÉ D'UNE TELLE SOUPAPE DE BRANCHEMENT DE COMPRESSEUR | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 02.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Request for further processing for: | 02.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HR | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | IE | 09.03.2011 | LT | 09.03.2011 | LV | 09.03.2011 | MT | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | NO | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | LU | 25.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 25.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 25.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 09.03.2011 | |
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2359615 (BROWNE KENNETH A, et al) [X] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 16 - line 30 *; | [XYA]DE3704967 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 49 - line 57 * [Y] 11 [A] 2-10; | [X]WO9001112 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 9, line 4 - line 6 *; | [X]JPH0488271 (JIDOSHA BUHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4310148 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 2* figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP1215378 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2004046519 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [Y] 11 * figure 4 *; | [X]WO2006121745 (BORGWARNER INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 10 * |