EP2225746 - METHOD FOR SPECIFYING A ROUTE AND ARRANGEMENT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Guido Kaethe-Kollwitz-Str. 23 06484 Quedlinburg / DE | 02 /
LAEDKE, Michael An Der Viehweide 5 31141 Hildesheim / DE | 03 /
STUEBNER, Guido Hagenbleckstr. 8 30455 Hannover / DE | [2010/36] | Application number, filing date | 08804950.7 | 01.10.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008EP63126 | Priority number, date | DE20071057715 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007057715 | [2010/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068352 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2225746 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2225746 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0968, G01C21/34 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
G08G1/096838 (EP,US);
G01C21/3415 (EP,US);
G01C21/3492 (EP,US);
G08G1/096827 (EP,US);
G08G1/096844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ROUTENBESTIMMUNG UND ANORDNUNG DAZU | [2010/36] | English: | METHOD FOR SPECIFYING A ROUTE AND ARRANGEMENT THEREFOR | [2010/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ITINÉRAIRE, ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 23.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | HR | 08.06.2011 | HU | 08.06.2011 | IE | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | LV | 08.06.2011 | MT | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | NO | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | LU | 01.10.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 01.10.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 01.10.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 01.10.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
NO | 08.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0703433 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,10 * abstract * * column 7, line 41 - line 49; figure 5 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 26; figure 9 * * column 11, line 51 - column 13, line 2; figure 15 * * column 13, line 11 - line 54; figures 17-19 *[A] 4-7,9; | [XA]EP1191307 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,10 * abstract * * column 7, line 27 - column 10, line 20; figures 3-5 * [A] 4,5,8,9; | [XA]EP1491859 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [X] 1,10 * column 9, line 35 - column 11, line 32; figure 1 * * column 12, line 41 - column 14, line 11; figures 3a,3b * [A] 2,3,7-9 | by applicant | EP1191307 | EP1491859 |