EP2223382 - ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaupunkt Antenna Systems GmbH & Co. KG Römerring 1 31137 Hildesheim / DE | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states ED Enterprises AG Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLICK, Bernd Schwarze Heide 17 31199 Diekholzen / DE | 02 /
SCHANO, Thomas Steinstr. 26 31180 Giesen / DE | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/35] | Kinkeldey, Daniela, et al Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08805252.7 | 13.10.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008EP63719 | Priority number, date | DE20071058247 | 04.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007058247 | [2010/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009071361 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223382 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/32 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3266 (EP,US);
H01Q1/325 (EP,US);
H01Q1/3283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG SOWIE VERFAHREN | [2010/35] | English: | ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD | [2010/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 01.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3802130 (HIRSCHMANN RADIOTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 54 *; | [DY]EP0383017 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) [DY] 8,9 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 12 *; | [A]US5629712 (ADRIAN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-7 ** column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 26 *; | [X]WO9735217 (LANG SABINE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 1, line 1 - page 12, line 19 *; | [DXY]WO0223668 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [DX] 1,3-7,10 * abstract * * figures 1,3-6 * * page 1, line 1 - page 23, line 24 * [Y] 8,9; | [A]US7002524 (BRANHAM MICHAEL DEAN [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 51 * |