EP2210718 - COUNTER-DIE FOR THE CYLINDERS OF ROTARY DIE CUTTING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rotary Diecutting Montenegro S.A. Ctra. Puxeiros a Mos, 54 36417 Torroso-Mos-Pontevedra / ES | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENGOA RODRIGUEZ, Elias Adolfo Carretera Puxeiros a Mos, 54 E-36417 Torroso-Mos / ES | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel Clarke, Modet & Co. C/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2011/26] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel Clarke, Modet & C. C/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2010/30] | Gil-Vega, Victor Corazón de Maria, 6 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08805330.1 | 16.07.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008ES00501 | Priority number, date | ES20070002448 | 14.09.2007 Original published format: ES 200702448 | [2010/30] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009034201 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | ES | [2009/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2210718 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210718 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 22.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/20 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
B26D7/20 (EP,ES,US);
B26D7/204 (EP,US);
B26F1/384 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4841 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7863 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9312 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | OBERSTEMPEL FÜR DIE ZYLINDER VON DREHSTANZEN | [2010/30] | English: | COUNTER-DIE FOR THE CYLINDERS OF ROTARY DIE CUTTING MACHINES | [2010/30] | French: | CONTRE-MATRICE POUR CYLINDRE DE MACHINES DE DÉCOUPAGE À L'EMPORTE-PIÈCE ROTATIVES | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2010 | Translation filed | 24.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 09.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2008 | AT | 16.04.2014 | BE | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | IE | 16.07.2014 | LU | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.07.2008 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3739675 (DUCKETT J, et al); | [XA]US5906149 (MONTENEGRO CRIADO MANUEL [ES]); | [A]US6116135 (WAGNER KENNETH [US]); | [XI]WO2005118238 (BHS CORR MASCH & ANLAGENBAU [DE], et al) | International search | [X]US3285642 (SAUER LOUIS E); | [A]US4982639 (KIRKPATRICK ALAN D [US]); | [X]WO9711823 (COR SERVE LIMITED [GB], et al) |