EP2147193 - INSTALLATION AND METHODS FOR STORING AND RECOVERING ELECTRIC ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saipem SA 1/7, avenue San Fernando 78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUER, Jacques 44, Avenue de la République F-78230 Le Pecq / FR | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie Tour Méditerranée 65 avenue Jules Cantini 13006 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie 232, avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR | ||
Former [2009/52] | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 232, Avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08805672.6 | 21.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008FR50712 | Priority number, date | FR20070055010 | 11.05.2007 Original published format: FR 0755010 | [2010/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008148962 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2147193 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147193 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02C1/04, F01K3/12, F01K25/00, F02C6/14 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
F01K3/12 (EP,US);
F01K25/00 (EP,US);
F02C1/04 (EP,US);
F02C6/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/04] | F01K3/12, F01K25/00, F02C6/14, H02J15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPEICHERUNG UND WIEDERGEWINNUNG ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE | [2010/04] | English: | INSTALLATION AND METHODS FOR STORING AND RECOVERING ELECTRIC ENERGY | [2010/04] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉS DE STOCKAGE ET RESTITUTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/04] | INSTALLATION ET PROCEDES DE STOCKAGE ET RESTITUTION D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 18.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2008 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | IE | 21.04.2014 | LU | 21.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.04.2008 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 21.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 21.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 21.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 21.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 21.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006072185 (NEW WORLD GENERATION INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 2, line 26 - page 5, line 27; figure -; claim - * * abstract *; | [A]JP2004138043 (SFC KK) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [A]US4094148 (NELSON HAZEN E) [A] 1-29 * column 2, line 54 - column 15, line 32; figure -; claim - * * abstract *; | [A]US3818697 (GILLI P) [A] 1-29 * column 2, line 32 - column 14, line 5; figure -; claim - * * abstract * | by applicant | WO2005108758 | WO2006072185 |