EP2156036 - SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE SUPERCHARGING PRESSURE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING TWO STAGED TURBOCHARGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault SAS 13-15, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUINOIS, Arnaud 4, Villa des Gobelins F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
FONTVIEILLE, Laurent 9, rue de la ferme de Belleville F-91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
MOULIN, Philippe 30, rue du faubourg Montmartre F-75009 Paris / FR | 04 /
SAAB, Ahmad 16, rue Auguste Blanqui F-94250 Gentilly / FR | [2010/08] | Application number, filing date | 08805774.0 | 14.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008FR50826 | Priority number, date | FR20070055456 | 05.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0755456 | [2010/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008152269 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156036 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2156036 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D23/00, F02B37/013, F02B37/18, F02B37/16 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
F02B37/013 (EP);
F02B37/004 (EP);
F02B37/16 (EP);
F02B37/18 (EP);
F02D23/00 (EP);
F02B29/0412 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
F02D2041/1419 (EP);
F02D41/0007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR REGELUNG DES ÜBERLADUNGSDRUCKS EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS MIT ZWEI GESTUFTEN TURBOLADERN | [2010/08] | English: | SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE SUPERCHARGING PRESSURE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING TWO STAGED TURBOCHARGERS | [2010/08] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE LA PRESSION DE SURALIMENTATION POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A DEUX TURBOCOMPRESSEURS ETAGES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 05.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2011 | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | DK | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | FI | 12.01.2011 | HR | 12.01.2011 | HU | 12.01.2011 | IE | 12.01.2011 | LT | 12.01.2011 | LV | 12.01.2011 | MT | 12.01.2011 | NL | 12.01.2011 | PL | 12.01.2011 | RO | 12.01.2011 | SE | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | TR | 12.01.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | NO | 12.04.2011 | GR | 13.04.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | PT | 12.05.2011 | LU | 14.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
LU | 14.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
LU | 14.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 12.01.2011 | |
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004005945 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,8,10 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0033] - [0046] * * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]FR2878285 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4,8 * page 9, line 15 - page 14, line 13 ** figures 3-6 *; | [A]FR2879251 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1,4,5,8-10 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 13 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 12 * * figures 1,2 * |