EP2197641 - PROCESS FOR CURING AND DRYING CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/25] | PROCESS FOR CURING AND DRYING REINFORCED CONCRETE | ||
[2010/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danish Concrete Technology Holding Aps Roemersgade 20 1362 Copenhagen K / DK | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLM, Claus Ludwig Engelbrecht Gartnervej 7 3060 Espergaerde / DK | 02 /
BIRCH-RASMUSSEN, Soeren Abildtoften 50 Ganloese 2660 Stenloese / DK | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
HOLM, Claus Ludwig Engelbrecht Tibberup Moellevej 18 3060 Espergaerde / DK | ||
02 /
BIRCH-RASMUSSEN, Soeren Abildtoften 50 Ganloese 2660 Stenloese / DK | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Vester So̸gade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 08806955.4 | 01.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008IB02256 | Priority number, date | DK20070001249 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: DK 200701249 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009027813 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2197641 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197641 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/24, F26B3/347, C04B40/02 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B28B11/245 (EP);
B28B11/241 (EP);
C04B40/0218 (EP);
F26B3/347 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | B28B11/24, F26B3/347 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSHÄRTUNG UND TROCKNUNG VON BETON | [2010/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR CURING AND DRYING CONCRETE | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DURCISSEMENT ET DE SÉCHAGE DU BÉTON | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/25] | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSHÄRTUNG UND TROCKNUNG VON STAHLBETON | ||
Former [2010/25] | PROCESS FOR CURING AND DRYING REINFORCED CONCRETE | ||
Former [2010/25] | PROCÉDÉ DE DURCISSEMENT ET DE SÉCHAGE DU BÉTON ARMÉ | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 19.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HR | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | MT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | NO | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | IE | 01.09.2011 | LU | 01.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.09.2011 | ||
LU | 01.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.09.2011 | ||
LU | 01.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.09.2011 | ||
LU | 01.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 23.02.2011 | |
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2068098 (DOBSON PARK IND) [A] 13* the whole document *; | [X]WO8203622 (SICOWA VERFAHRENSTECH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 32; example 1 *; | [X]JPH0343201 (SHIKOKU SOGO KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0710657 (OTA FUKUO, et al) [X] 1,8-12,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] *; | [X]DE19633879 (FORKEL KLAUS DR RER NAT [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-12,17 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 8; claim - * | by applicant | US4338135 | US4687374 | US5245149 |