EP2258155 - ELECTRICAL SHIELDING CAGE AND SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI Le Jupiter 8, Parc Ariane 2 rue Hélène Boucher 78280 Guyancourt / FR | [2013/35] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states FCI 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 Rue Alfred Kastler 78280 Guyancourt / FR | ||
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states FCI 145/147 rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTENEAU, Michel 32 rue Jules Chéret F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 02 /
GABRIELSSON, Per, Georg Snarvidevägen 271 S-165 74 Hässelby / SE | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2012/13] |
Former [2010/49] | Regi, François-Xavier FCI - IP Department 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 rue Alfred Kastler 78284 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08806995.0 | 26.03.2008 | [2010/49] | WO2008IB02301 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118581 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258155 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00, H01R13/658 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H05K9/0058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER ABSCHIRMKÄFIG UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2010/49] | English: | ELECTRICAL SHIELDING CAGE AND SYSTEM THEREFOR | [2010/49] | French: | CAGE DE BLINDAGE ÉLECTRIQUE ET SYSTÈME POUR CELLE-CI | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 29.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004077217 (HWANG JENQ-YIN [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2005208831 (LEE CHIEH [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0019]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0021] *; | [A]US2006003632 (LONG JERRY A [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figure 3 *; | [A]US6666720 (REISINGER JASON M CHEYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 32; figure 1 * * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 18; figures 3,4 * |