EP2193171 - THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR MAKING' THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen Op Zoom OH / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCX, Franciscus Verduinsbos 43 NL-4661 NT Bergen Op Zoom / NL | 02 /
TER HORST, Sascha Visarend 3 NL-4617 KB Bergen Op Zoom / NL | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Strehlke, Ingo Kurt Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Strehlke, Ingo Kurt Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08807833.2 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008IB53944 | Priority number, date | US20070975836P | 28.09.2007 Original published format: US 975836 P | US20080237595 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: US 237595 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009040774 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2193171 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193171 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
C08J3/201 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08L101/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/12 (KR);
H01B1/20 (KR);
C08K2201/001 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2010/23] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR MAKING' THEREOF | [2010/23] | French: | COMPOSITION THERMOPLASTIQUE À COMPORTEMENT À COEFFICIENT POSITIF DE TEMPÉRATURE AMÉLIORÉ ET SES MÉTHODES D'OBTENTION | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Request for further processing for: | 22.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.2011 | BE | 06.07.2011 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | HR | 06.07.2011 | HU | 06.07.2011 | IT | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | MT | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | IE | 26.09.2011 | LU | 26.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | NO | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | ES | 17.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0853322 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-14* example 1; claims 1-27 *; | [X]WO0109905 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-5; claims 1-14 *; | [DX]US6197219 (FOULGER STEPHEN H [US]) [DX] 1-14 * examples 1-7; claims 1-39 *; | [X]WO0237507 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-14; claims 1-47 *; | [X]US6396384 (BLOK EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * example 1; claims 1-38 *; | [X]WO0242372 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1,2; claims 1-29 *; | [X]WO0245098 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-7; claims 1-29 *; | [DX]US6479575 (CHU FU-HUA [TW], et al) [DX] 1-14 * examples 1-8; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US2002183438 (AMARASEKERA JAYANTHA [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1,2; claims 1-41 *; | [X]US2004039096 (PATEL NIRAJ C [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-7; claims 1-31 *; | [X]US2004169162 (XIAO YUE [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-5; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US2004262581 (RODRIGUES DAVID E [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-3; claims 1-19 *; | [X]US2005067406 (RAJARAJAN SHANMUGAM [IN], et al) [X] 1-14 * example 1; claims 1-15 *; | [X]US2005112331 (DONEA CONSTANTIN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * example 1; claims 1-28 *; | [X]WO2006029145 (PRC DESOTO INT INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * example 1; claims 1-39 *; | [X]US2006135668 (HAYES RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-41; claims 1-116 * |