EP2320036 - CAM SHAFT PHASE VARIABLE DEVICE IN ENGINE FOR AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nittan Valve Co., Ltd. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMEDA, Michihiro c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | 02 /
NAGADO, Masayasu c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | [2013/27] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
KAMEDA, Michihiro c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGADO, Masayasu c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08810137.3 | 05.09.2008 | [2011/19] | WO2008JP66082 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010026645 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320036 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2320036 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/34, F01L1/352 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
F01L1/352 (EP,US);
F01L1/34 (KR);
F01L1/344 (KR);
F01L2001/3522 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | F01L1/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER NOCKENWELLENPHASE IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUGMOTOR | [2011/19] | English: | CAM SHAFT PHASE VARIABLE DEVICE IN ENGINE FOR AUTOMOBILE | [2011/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VARIATION DE PHASE D'ARBRE À CAMES DANS UN MOTEUR POUR AUTOMOBILE | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2011 | Translation filed | 28.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2008 | AT | 03.07.2013 | BE | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | IT | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | IE | 05.09.2013 | LU | 05.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006231052 (YAMANAKA ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005061277 (TAKENAKA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002100446 (WATANABE MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002100444 (TODO TAMOTSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003129805 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003145815 (MIYAKOSHI RYO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003070641 (WATANABE MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004035997 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19830930 (BAUSS HANS WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004007052 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2006077779 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2004003419 (DENSO CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2006077779 | JP2008057857 |