EP2158479 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATIC NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION OF TUBULAR AXLE PINS HAVING VARIABLE INSIDE AND OUTSIDE RADIUS PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/09] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATIC NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION OF TUBULAR AXLE PINS HAVING VARIABLE INSIDE AND OUTSIDE RADIUS PROFILES | ||
[2013/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vallourec Tubes France 27 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/01] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states V & M FRANCE 27 Avenue du Géneral Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESAGE, Frédéric 5 rue Duchesnois F-59880 Saint-Saulve / FR | 02 /
NOËL, Alexandre 600 rue du Sarloton F-59144 Gommegnies / FR | 03 /
NOGUEIRA DE PAULA, Renato 47 avenue de Verdun F-59300 Valenciennes / FR | [2010/29] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
LESAGE, Frédéric 5 rue Duchesnois F-59880 Saint-Saulve / FR | ||
02 /
NOËL, Alexandre 12 rue du Vert Gazon F-59530 Englefontaine / FR | |||
03 /
NOGUEIRA DE PAULA, Renato 44 avenue de Verdun F-59300 Valenciennes / FR | Representative(s) | de Kernier, Gabriel Cabinet Netter Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/13] |
Former [2010/09] | de Kernier, Gabriel Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08826362.9 | 16.06.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008FR00836 | Priority number, date | FR20070004435 | 21.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0704435 | [2010/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009010653 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2158479 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158479 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/06, G01N29/22, G01N29/26, G01N29/265, G01N29/27, G01S15/89, G01M17/00 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
G01N29/262 (EP,US);
G01N29/0609 (EP,US);
G01N29/225 (EP,US);
G01N29/265 (EP,US);
G01N29/27 (EP,US);
G01N2291/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN INSPEKTION VON HOHLACHSEN MIT VARIABLEN INNEN- UND AUSSENRADIUSPROFILEN | [2014/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATIC NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION OF TUBULAR AXLE PINS HAVING VARIABLE INSIDE AND OUTSIDE RADIUS PROFILES | [2014/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONTRÔLE NON DESTRUCTIF AUTOMATIQUE D'AXES D'ESSIEU TUBULAIRES À PROFILS DE RAYONS INTERNE ET EXTERNE VARIABLES | [2014/04] |
Former [2010/09] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN NICHTDESTRUKTIVEN INSPEKTION RÖHRENFÖRMIGER ACHSZAPFEN MIT VARIABLEN INNEN- UND AUSSENRADIUSPROFILEN | ||
Former [2010/09] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATIC NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION OF TUBULAR AXLE PINS HAVING VARIABLE INSIDE AND OUTSIDE RADIUS PROFILES | ||
Former [2010/09] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONTROLE NON DESTRUCTIF AUTOMATIQUE D'AXES D'ESSIEU TUBULAIRES A PROFILS DE RAYONS INTERNE ET EXTERNE VARIABLES | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2008 | AT | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | IE | 16.06.2014 | LU | 16.06.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | BE | 30.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.06.2008 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 16.06.2014 | ||
LU | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 16.06.2014 | ||
LU | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 16.06.2014 | ||
LU | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 16.06.2014 | ||
LU | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 16.06.2014 | ||
LU | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3642717 (GLYCO ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,19 * abstract ** column 7, line 48 - column 10, line 7 *; | [A]DE4334632 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 10, line 25 *; | [A]JP2002257798 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1,19 * abstract *; | [X]DE202004015456U (CEGELEC ANLAGEN UND AUTOMATISI [DE]) [X] 1-37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0030] - [0047] *; | [X]WO2006099397 (TRANSP TECHNOLOGY CT INC [US]) [X] 1,19 * abstract * * page 6, line 3 - page 11, line 14 * |