EP2175721 - METHODS OF AND FORMULATIONS FOR REDUCING AND INHIBITING THE GROWTH OF THE CONCENTRATION OF MICROBES IN WATER-BASED FLUIDS AND SYSTEMS USED WITH THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Bei 1342 Devonshire Road Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | 02 /
YANG, Jingjun 1800 Jinke Road, A18 Shanghai 201-2003 / CN | 03 /
LENOIR, Pierre Marie Untermatte 24 Richterswil ZH-8805 / CH | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2010/16] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08826509.5 | 21.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008US70651 | Priority number, date | US20070951614P | 24.07.2007 Original published format: US 951614 P | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009015088 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175721 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175721 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N35/02, A01N43/76, A01N43/90, A01N57/20, C09K8/86, C02F1/50, C09D5/14, C09D5/16, C10M141/10, A01P1/00 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C10M173/00 (EP,US);
A01N57/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/50 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
C10M141/10 (EP,US);
C02F2301/08 (EP,US);
C02F2303/08 (EP,US);
C02F5/00 (EP,US);
C10M2207/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/16 (EP,US);
C10M2215/202 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2219/104 (EP,US);
C10M2223/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N57/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N57/20, A01N35/02, A01N43/76, A01N43/90 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2010/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 26.05.2010 | BA | 26.05.2010 | MK | 26.05.2010 | RS | 26.05.2010 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR REDUKTION UND HEMMUNG DES WACHSTUMS VON MIKROBEN IN WASSERBASIERTEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2016/31] | English: | METHODS OF AND FORMULATIONS FOR REDUCING AND INHIBITING THE GROWTH OF THE CONCENTRATION OF MICROBES IN WATER-BASED FLUIDS AND SYSTEMS USED WITH THEM | [2010/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET FORMULATIONS POUR RÉDUIRE ET INHIBER L'AUGMENTATION DE LA CONCENTRATION DE MICROBES DANS DES FLUIDES AQUEUX ET SYSTÈMES LES UTILISANT | [2010/16] |
Former [2010/16] | VERFAHREN UND FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR REDUZIERUNG UND HEMMUNG DES WACHSTUMS DER KONZENTRATION VON MIKROBEN IN FLÜSSIGKEITEN AUF WASSERBASIS SOWIE SYSTEME DAMIT | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2008 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | IT | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | IE | 21.07.2017 | LU | 21.07.2017 | MT | 21.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.07.2008 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.07.2008 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.07.2008 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0385801 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]) [Y] 1-44 * page 2, lines 30-51 * * page 3, lines 2-24 * * page 5, lines 52,53 * * page 6, lines 32-37; example 1 *; | [Y]EP1402778 (AIR LIQUIDE SANTE INT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-44 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024] , [0029] , [0033] *; | [Y]JPH11222408 ; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 43, Database accession no. 1999-512415, XP002546000 & JPH11222408 A 19990817 (KATAKURA KAGAKU KOGYO KENKYUSHO KK) [Y] 1-44 * abstract * | [Y] - Bioban CS-1135, DOW, (20021010), XP002545999 [Y] 1-44 * the whole document * | [Y] - DOW, "BIOBAN CS-1246", (20021010), URL: http://www.dow.com/biocides/prod/bbcs1246.htm, (20090916), XP002513771 [Y] 1-44 * the whole document * |