EP2145185 - MULTIANALYTE ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Change: Despatch of communication that application is refused | 14.04.2017 | Change - refusal | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexus DX, Inc. 6759 Mesa Ridge Road, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Nanogen Inc. 10398 Pacific Center Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGAN, Richard, Laswell 3949 Stanford Drive Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | 02 /
LIDGARD, Graham, Peter 1432 Torrey Pines Rd La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
BOOKER, David, Dickson 4895 Glenhollow Circle Oceanside, CA 92057 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Christopher, Johann 3735 Mount Blackburn Avenue San Diego, CA 92111 / US | 05 /
BELENKY, Alexander 4768 35th Street, No. 6 San Diego, CA 92116 / US | 06 /
VUKAJLOVICH, Stan 4935 34th Street San Diego, CA 92116 / US | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane GB-Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08826586.3 | 30.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US62088 | Priority number, date | US20070915051P | 30.04.2007 Original published format: US 915051 P | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009014787 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2145185 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/48, G01N33/574, G01N35/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (US);
B01L3/0272 (EP,US);
B01L3/5023 (EP,US);
B01L3/5029 (EP,US);
G01N2333/11 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | MULTIANALYT-ASSAY | [2010/03] | English: | MULTIANALYTE ASSAY | [2010/03] | French: | DOSAGE DE PLUSIEURS ANALYTES | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 18.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [ N /P ] | 29.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 29.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [ N /P ] | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/20] | 08.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2010 | 30.04.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2013 | 30.04.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPLI]WO2007098184 (NANOGEN INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-2,4-13,15 * The priority claim of the present application is invalid, because the subject-matter was already disclosed by the applicant in this still earlier application. * * the whole document, in particular paragraphs [0028], [0032], [0089], [0091], [0092], [0094]-[0096], [0179], [0211], [0267], [0287], [0305]-[0307], [0323], [0339], [0342], [0368], [0386], [0460], [0494]-[0501]; figures 1-5 and 32; claims 1, 6, 7, 36, 43, 48, 49, 53, 63, 65, 66, 72, 75, 82 * [L] 1-15 [I] 3,14; | [A] - anonymous, "Detergents", (2003), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://wolfson.huji.ac.il/purification/PDF/detergents/CALBIOCHEM-DetergentsIII.pdf, (20100324), XP002574889 [A] 2-3 * the whole document, in particular page 4, compounds "saponin" and "zwittergent 3-12" * | International search | [A]US5837466 (LANE DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US6719691 (KRITZMAN AMNON [IL], et al); | [X]US2004197793 (HASSIBI ARJANG [US], et al); | [X] - P. CORSTJENS ET AL., "Use of up-converting phosphor reporters in lateral-flow assays to detect specific nucleic acid sequences: A rapid, sensitive DNA test to identify human Papillomavirus type 16 infection.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 47, no. 10, pages 1885 - 1893, XP002461322 | [X] - S. HASHIDA ET AL., "Detection of one attomole of [Arg8]-vasopressin by novel noncompetitive enzyme immunoassay (hetero-two-site complex transfer enzyme immunoassay)", J. BIOCHEM., (1991), vol. 110, no. 4, pages 486 - 492, XP008120902 | Examination | JP2007046959 |