EP2178591 - TRACHEOSTOMY VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/17] | TRACHEOSTOMY VALVES AND RELATED METHODS | ||
[2019/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Passy-Muir, Inc. 4521 Campus Drive, 273 Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARE, Rex, O. 22467 Overlake Drive Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 02 /
SCHERER, Andrew, J. 21103 Wood Hollow Lane Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/19] |
Former [2010/17] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08826674.7 | 30.07.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008US71654 | Priority number, date | US20070830573 | 30.07.2007 Original published format: US 830573 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009018384 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178591 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2178591 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/20, A61M16/04 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61M16/0468 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US);
A61M2206/11 (US);
A61M2207/00 (US);
Y10T137/789 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | A61M16/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2010/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRACHEOSTOMAVENTILE | [2019/47] | English: | TRACHEOSTOMY VALVES | [2019/47] | French: | VALVULES DE TRACHÉOSTOMIE | [2019/47] |
Former [2010/17] | TRACHEOSTOMAVENTILE UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2010/17] | TRACHEOSTOMY VALVES AND RELATED METHODS | ||
Former [2010/17] | VALVULES DE TRACHÉOSTOMIE ET PROCÉDÉS APPARENTÉS | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2008 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | IE | 30.07.2020 | LU | 30.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | FR | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 06.05.2020 | |
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4325366 (TABOR CARL J) [A] 1,4,11 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-4 *; | [YDA]US4759356 (MUIR DAVID [US]) [YD] 15 * column 7, line 57 - column 10, line 30; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,4,11; | [Y]US5806515 (BARE REX O [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 47; figure 3 *; | [A]US2004182446 (SEMEIA ROBERTO [IT]) [A] 1,4,11* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0060]; figures 4-17B *; | [XYI]US7025784 (BLOM ERIC D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-14 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 30; figures 1-9 * [Y] 6,7,15 [I] 8 | International search | [X]US4759356 (MUIR DAVID [US]); | [Y]US7025784 (BLOM ERIC D [US], et al) | by applicant | US7025784 |