EP2180754 - BASE STATION APPARATUS AND TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08827268.7 | 06.08.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008JP64132 | Priority number, date | JP20070211587 | 14.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007211587 | [2010/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009022605 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180754 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/08 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
H04W56/007 (EP,KR,US);
H04L7/0054 (KR);
H04L1/0026 (KR);
H04W56/001 (KR);
H04W74/0833 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | H04W84/00, H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/17] | English: | BASE STATION APPARATUS AND TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD | [2010/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2010 | Translation filed | 19.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 20.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 08.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006086359 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,13 * page 17; claim 38 * * page 11, paragraph [0055] * * a), b), c); page 17 - page 18; claim 38 * * page 18; claims 40,41 * * page 19; claim 46 * * page 9, paragraph [0045] * [I] 3,4,6-8; | [E]EP2429130 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [E] 1,13 * page 6, column 10, line 47, paragraph [0066] - line 50 * * page 6, column 10, line 55, paragraph [0066] - line 56 * * page 6, column 10, line 58, paragraph [0066] - page 6, column 11, line 3 * * page 7, column 11, lines 10-13, paragraph [0066] * | International search | [A]JP2006129134 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13* , Full text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006295842 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-13 * , Full text (Family: none) *; | [PXA]EP1881657 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-6, 10, 11, 13 * , Par. Nos. [0051] to [0057] & US 2008/0019279 A1 * [PA] 7-9, 12 |