EP2182853 - SUSPENSION/RETRACTION DEVICE FOR SURGICAL MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Kurt, Eric 227 Church Street Apt. 7G New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2010/19] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08827410.5 | 08.08.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008US09530 | Priority number, date | US20070964319P | 10.08.2007 Original published format: US 964319 P | US20080060970P | 12.06.2008 Original published format: US 60970 P | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009023136 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2182853 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/0218 (US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00212 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00283 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0225 (US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0608 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | AUFHÄNGE-/EINZUGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR CHIRURGISCHE EINGRIFFE | [2010/19] | English: | SUSPENSION/RETRACTION DEVICE FOR SURGICAL MANIPULATION | [2010/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION/RÉTRACTION POUR MANIPULATION CHIRURGICALE | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5415666 (GOURLAY STUART J [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 6, lines 35-42; figures 2,14-23; claims 27,40,55 *; | [A]US2002049367 (IRION KLAUS M [DE], et al) [A] 11* paragraph [0093]; figures 1,8 *; | [A]US2004034345 (LENTZ DAVID J [US]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0012] , [0022] , [0030]; figures 2,3; claim 10 *; | [YA]US2004050395 (UEDA HIROHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 11-13 * . * * paragraphs [0052] - [0057] - [0064] - [0068] - [0073] , [0074] , [0076]; figures 1,2,6-11,14-16,19,20 * [A] 1-5,8; | [A]US2004111100 (BENDEREV THEODORE V [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * figures 6-10 *; | [A]US2004138645 (LONKY NEAL M [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 5, lines 5-11; figures 2-4,7 *; | [XYI]US2006149135 (PAZ ADRIAN [IL]) [X] 1-4,8 * . * * paragraphs [0081] - [0098] - [0103] , [0109] , [0111] , [0119] , [0127] , [0129] , [0134] - [0136] - [0141] - [0143] - [0151] * * paragraphs [0197] , [0201] - [0213] - [0220] - [0225] - [0229] - [0233] - [0247] , [0248] , [0252] , [0266] , [0278] * * paragraphs [0279] , [0299]; figures 1-9,12-15,19-24,29-30c,32-36; claims 29,30,32,33,37 * [Y] 9-13 [I] 5-7 | International search | [Y]US6358196 (RAYMAN REIZA [CA]); | [Y]US6440061 (WENNER DONALD E [US], et al); | [X]US2005251207 (FLORES JESUS [US], et al); | [Y]US2006217681 (HART CHARLES C [US], et al) |