EP2175819 - FECAL INCONTINENCE DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/16] | FECAL INCONTINENCE DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2015/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renew Medical, Inc. 1065 E Hillsdale Blvd, Suite 410 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Renew Medical, Inc. 532 Emerson Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | ||
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Svip 3 Llc 155 Island Drive Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHALON, Tidhar 64 Pinkas Street 62261 Tel-aviv / IL | 02 /
KOTLIZKY, Guy 20a HaRakafot Street 46910 Kfar-shemaryahu / IL | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/05] | Speich, Stéphane, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Luxembourg-Howald / LU | ||
Former [2012/47] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2010/16] | Fichter, Robert Arno Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 08828891.5 | 05.11.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008IL01450 | Priority number, date | US20070996275P | 08.11.2007 Original published format: US 996275 P | US20080064374P | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 64374 P | [2011/37] |
Former [2010/16] | US20070996275P | 08.11.2007 | |
US20080064374 | 29.02.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009060437 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175819 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175819 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2175819 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
A61F2/0009 (EP,US);
A61F2/0004 (US);
A61F5/48 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0057 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0061 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/16] | A61F13/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2010/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 19.02.2010 | BA | 19.02.2010 | RS | 19.02.2010 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR DARMINKONTINENZ | [2015/15] | English: | FECAL INCONTINENCE DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2015/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME POUR TRAITER L'INCONTINENCE FÉCALE | [2015/15] |
Former [2010/16] | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DARMINKONTINENZ | ||
Former [2010/16] | FECAL INCONTINENCE DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2010/16] | DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER L'INCONTINENCE FÉCALE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2009 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 11.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11170858.2 / EP2428185 | EP13151819.3 / EP2612617 | EP13151868.0 / EP2606850 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2008 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MT | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | LU | 05.11.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | HR | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2136318 (RAM MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * claim 3 ** figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US6096057 (KLINGENSTEIN R JAMES [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1a,1b * * column 4, line 4 - line 31 * * column 5, line 6 - line 13 * [Y] 9,10 [I] 2-8,11-15 | International search | [Y]US3127893 (MONTAGUE JOSEPH F); | [X]US3570489 (BROWN JAMES GRAHAM); | [Y]US3841304 (JONES A); | [Y]US5513659 (BUUCK ROBERT E [US], et al); | [Y]US5749826 (FAULKNER JAMES W [US]); | [X]US6096057 (KLINGENSTEIN R JAMES [US]); | [Y]US6440060 (LATOUR JR ROBERT A [US]); | [Y]US2004267198 (TORSTENSEN JAN [DK], et al); | [Y]WO2007077551 (MOR RESEARCH APPLIC LTD [IL], et al) | by applicant | US6471635 | US6749556 | US6907293 | WO2006047833 | US7054689 | - VAIZEY; KAMM, BRITISH JOURNAL OF SURGERY, (2005), vol. 92, pages 521 - 527 | - MCMAHON ET AL., NEUROGASTROENTEROL. MOTIL, (2005), vol. 17, pages 531 - 540 | - MORREN G.L., BRITISH JOURNAL OF SURGERY, (2001), vol. 88, pages 1506 - 1512 | - GOLD, D.M., BRITISH JOURNAL OF SURGERY, (1999), vol. 86, pages 365 - 370 | US20020269949 | US20030651851 |