EP2171014 - ANTIFREEZE CONCENTRATE AND COOLANT COMPOSITIONS AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A., Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, 3rd floor San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEVENS, Serge, S. Schellebellepontwg 22 B-9820 Merelbeke / BE | 02 /
DEKIMPE, Jurgen, P. Neerscheldestrant 19 B-9050 Gent / BE | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2015/36] |
Former [2010/14] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08831121.2 | 20.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US67701 | Priority number, date | US20070769943 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: US 769943 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009035741 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171014 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2171014 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/20 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
C23F11/124 (EP,US);
C09K5/20 (EP,US);
C23F11/08 (EP,US);
C23F11/10 (EP,US);
C23F11/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2010/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GEFRIERSCHUTZKONZENTRAT UND KÜHLMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2010/14] | English: | ANTIFREEZE CONCENTRATE AND COOLANT COMPOSITIONS AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [2010/14] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CONCENTRÉ D'ANTIGEL ET DE LIQUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET LEUR PRÉPARATION | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2008 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | IT | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]CA2307621 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * page 1, paragraphs 1,2; example 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [X]DE19846434 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 12; claims 1-3,6-8,10,11 *; | [X]WO0050532 (ASHLAND INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-15 * page 1, lines 4-13; table 1 * * page 3, lines 16-19 * * page 6, line 6 - page 11, line 22 * * page 19, lines 5-25 * * page 28, lines 1-14 *; | [X]WO03054108 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * page 1, lines 7-35; claims 1-3,7,10 ** page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 12; example 1 * | Examination | US4851145 | US5997763 |