EP2191267 - SOLID SUBSTRATE WITH SURFACE BOUND MOLECULES AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry- Foundation San 31, Hyoja-dong Nam-gu Pohang-shi Kyungsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | For all designated states POSCO 1 Koi-dong Nam-ku Pohang, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry Foundation San 31, Hyoja-dong Nam-gu Pohang-shi Kyungsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | ||
For all designated states Posco 1 Koi-dong Nam-ku Pohang, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Joon Won Kyosu Apt. 8-1303 Jigok-dond Nam-gu Pohang-si Kyungsangbuk-do 790-390 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Bong Jin Green Apt. 216-202 Jigok-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si Kyungsangbuk-do 790-390 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Duk Hoe Sungdongmaeul Suji Xi Apt. 102-101 Seongbok-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-791 / KR | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08831597.3 | 17.09.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008IB03808 | Priority number, date | US20070973079P | 17.09.2007 Original published format: US 973079 P | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009037600 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2191267 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, C12Q1/68 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01Q60/42 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFSUBSTRAT MIT OBERFLÄCHENBINDUNGSMOLEKÜLEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2010/22] | English: | SOLID SUBSTRATE WITH SURFACE BOUND MOLECULES AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING AND USING THE SAME | [2010/22] | French: | SUBSTRAT SOLIDE A MOLECULES LIEES EN SURFACE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION DUDIT SUBSTRAT | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 17.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 07.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006016787 (POSTECH FOUNDATION [KR]; POSCO [KR]; PARK JOON WON [KR]; JUNG YU JIN [) [X] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [X]US2007128623 (PARK JOON-WON [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * figure 12 *; | [A]WO2007046819 (CALIFORNIA INSTITUE OF TECHNOL [US]; WADE LAWARENCE A [US]; COLLIER CH) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2003013124 (JENNIFER M. LU KUO ET AL.); | [A]US2006285997 (NELLE LYNN SLACK ET AL.); | [A]KR20070000667 (KOREA RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY) |