EP2207879 - IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION OF FETAL CELLS AND NUCLEIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2012/15] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Biocept, Inc. 5810 Nancy Ridge Drive, Suite 150 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISCHOFF, Farideh 3314 N. Briarpark Lane Sugar Land Texas 77479 / US | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Clegg, Richard Ian Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Clegg, Richard Ian Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08831741.7 | 22.09.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008US77251 | Priority number, date | US20070974392P | 21.09.2007 Original published format: US 974392 P | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009039507 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2207879 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C07K16/28, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/68 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/6875 (EP,KR);
G01N33/5044 (EP,KR);
C07K16/18 (KR);
G01N33/5091 (EP,KR);
G01N33/5302 (KR);
G01N33/533 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | C12N15/09, C07K16/28, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ISOLIERUNG FÖTALER ZELLEN UND NUKLEINSÄURE | [2010/29] | English: | IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION OF FETAL CELLS AND NUCLEIC ACID | [2010/29] | French: | IDENTIFICATION ET ISOLEMENT DE CELLULES ET D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE F TAUX | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 07.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 10.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]WO2007121276 (BIOCEPT INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-10,12-16,21,22,26,29-33 * the whole document *[I] 11,17-20,23-25,27,28 | International search | [X]US2004197832 (AMIEL ALIZA [IL], et al); | [X]US2005181429 (FEJGIN MOSHE D [IL], et al); | [A]US2006041946 (FISHER ADAMA G [GB]); | [XP]US2007243549 (BISCHOFF FARIDEH Z [US]); | [Y] - GODFRIED W. VAN DER HEIJDEN ET AL., "Asymmetry in histone H3 variants and lysine methylation between paternal and maternal chromatin of the early mouse zygote.", MECHANISMS OF DEVELOPMENT., (200509), vol. 122, no. 9, pages 1008 - 1022, XP025329302 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mod.2005.04.009 | by applicant | WO2007121276 |