EP2190304 - NUTRITIONAL FORMULATION WITH HIGH ENERGY CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOIJER, Maarten Anne G.A. van Nispenstraat 7 NL-6814 JA Arnhem / NL | 02 /
SIJBEN, Johannes Wilhelmus Christina Lawickse Allee 106 NL-6707 AN Wageningen / NL | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/49] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2010/22] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08831921.5 | 17.09.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008NL50607 | Priority number, date | WO2007NL00230 | 17.09.2007 Original published format: PCT/NL2007/000230 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009038458 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190304 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2190304 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A61K38/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/13 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54, A23V2250/1882, A23V2200/33, A23V2250/51, A23V2250/50, A23V2200/308, A23V2200/302, A23V2200/326 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | ERNÄHRUNGSFORMULIERUNG MIT HOHEM ENERGETISCHEN GEHALT | [2010/22] | English: | NUTRITIONAL FORMULATION WITH HIGH ENERGY CONTENT | [2010/22] | French: | FORMULATION NUTRITIONNELLE RICHE EN ÉNERGIE | [2011/26] |
Former [2010/22] | FORMULATION NUTRITIONNELLE RICHES EN ÉNERGIE | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 30.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11192130.0 / EP2428125 | EP17171310.0 / EP3263120 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2012
18.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Str. 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Heimann, Axel Colin Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 02
05.09.2012
18.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 03
07.09.2012
18.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2012
18.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Str. 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Heimann, Axel Colin Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | ||
02
05.09.2012
18.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | |||
03
07.09.2012
18.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2012/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Str. 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Heimann, Axel Colin Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | ||
02
05.09.2012
Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | |||
03
07.09.2012
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2012/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2012
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Str. 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Heimann, Axel Colin Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | ||
02
05.09.2012
Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 25.10.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.07.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/52] | Appeal following opposition | 31.03.2014 | Appeal received No. T0784/14 | 23.06.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.07.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 21.07.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2008 | CH | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | HR | 07.12.2011 | LI | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | LV | 07.12.2011 | MT | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | BG | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | LU | 17.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2016/06] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 17.09.2008 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
LU | 17.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
LU | 17.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0239978 (FRESENIUS KABI DE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 9, line 23 - page 13, line 3; example 2; claims 1,9-11,17-25 *; | [A]WO2004032651 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004093557 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0025]; claims 1,5,8; table 1 *; | [A]EP1634599 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [XD]WO2006091103 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 1 - line 22 * * page 5, line 7 - page 10, line 14 * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 27 * * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 22; example 3; claims 1,9-11,13,15-17 *; | [XD]WO2007046699 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,3-6 * page 3, line 21 - page 10, line 21 * * page 11, line 27 - page 13, line 21; example 6; claims 1-7,9-13,15 *; | [XD]WO2007073193 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,3-5 * page 4, line 1 - line 30 * * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 33 * * page 16, line 12 - page 18, line 34; example 4; claims 1,3,5-7,10-16 *; | [XP]WO2008005869 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [XP] 1-5 * page 45, line 23 - line 30; examples 1-4; claims 1,6,15,21,29,30; table 1 *; | [XP]WO2008048094 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-5 * claims 1,2,5-9,11-14 * |