EP2195689 - LOW-EMISSIVITY WINDOW FILMS AND COATINGS INCOPORATING NANOSCALE WIRE GRIDS& xA; [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ravenbrick, LLC 2201 A Lawrence Street Denver, CO 80205 / US | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCARTHY, Wil 1129 South Quail Street Lakewood Colorado 80232 / US | 02 /
CISZEK, Paul 2550 South University Boulevard, Apt. 305 Denver, Colorado 80210 / US | 03 /
POWERS, Richard M. 14400 West Yale Place Lakewood Colorado 80228 / US | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
MCCARTHY, Wil 1129 South Quail Street Lakewood Colorado 80232 / US | ||
02 /
CISZEK, Paul 484 South Wright Street 107 Lakewood Colorado 80228 / US | |||
03 /
POWERS, Richard M. 14400 West Yale Place Lakewood Colorado 80228 / US | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08832045.2 | 19.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008US77095 | Priority number, date | US20070994370P | 19.09.2007 Original published format: US 994370 P | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009039423 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2195689 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/10 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
G02B5/1866 (EP,US);
G02B5/1861 (EP,US);
G02B5/208 (EP,US);
G02B5/3058 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | FENSTERFILME UND BESCHICHTUNGEN MIT GERINGEN EMISSIONEN MIT NANOMASSSTAB-DRAHTGITTERN | [2010/24] | English: | LOW-EMISSIVITY WINDOW FILMS AND COATINGS INCOPORATING NANOSCALE WIRE GRIDS& xA; | [2010/24] | French: | FILMS DE FENÊTRE DE FAIBLE ÉMISSIVITÉ ET REVÊTEMENTS INCORPORANT DES GRILLES DE FIL D'ÉCHELLE NANOMÉTRIQUE | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 25.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4579638 (SCHERBER WERNER [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 20-54 *; | [Y]WO03096105 (MOXTEK INC [US], et al) [Y] 6,11 * page 3, lines 19-29 ** page 6, lines 24-34 *; | [XAY] - JOHN C. C. FAN ET AL, "Thin-film conducting microgrids as transparent heat mirrors", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19760101), vol. 28, no. 8, doi:10.1063/1.88790, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 440 - 442, XP055021550 [X] 1-5,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 7,8 [Y] 6,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.88790 | International search | [A]US4871220 (KOHIN MARGARET [US]); | [A]US5481400 (BORDEN MICHAEL R [US]); | [A]US7113335 (SALES TASSO R [US]) | Examination | US2002044351 | US2006274218 | FR2893610 |