EP2198238 - ROLLER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humanistic Robotics, Inc. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2170 Philadelphia, PA 19109 / US | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULRICH, Nathan 34 Sheep Road Lee NY 03824 / US | 02 /
KOPLIN, Joshua 1512 Lombard Street, 1F Philadelphia PA 19146 / US | 03 /
REEVES, Samuel 746 South Street, 3R Philadelphia PA 19147 / US | 04 /
AHNERT, Stephen 136 N. 2nd St. Apt. 3C Philadelphia PA 19106 / US | 05 /
DE BRUN, Erik 104 N. 2nd St. Apt. 404 Philadelphia PA 19106 / US | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08832571.7 | 19.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008US10890 | Priority number, date | US20070994705P | 20.09.2007 Original published format: US 994705 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009038762 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2198238 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F41H11/30 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
F41H11/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | F41H11/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2010 | BA | 31.03.2010 | MK | 31.03.2010 | RS | 31.03.2010 | Title | German: | ROLLENSYSTEM | [2010/25] | English: | ROLLER SYSTEM | [2010/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE ROULEAUX | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 26.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH11211397 (TOYO CONSTRUCTION) [X] 1-8,10,12-15,20,26-28,31,32 * the whole document * [Y] 9,11,16-19,21-25 [I] 29,30; | [YA]WO9738281 (SWEDISH DE MINING EQUIPMENT AK [SE], et al) [Y] 9,11,16-19,21-25 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 11 - line 17 * * page 5, line 29 - page 8, line 4 * [A] 8,10,12-15,20,26,27; | [X]EP1688699 (RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12,20,26-28,31,32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0020] , [0022] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] , [0030] *; | [A]WO0203007 (PEARSON ENG LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph l * | International search | [X]JPH11211397 (TOYO CONSTRUCTION); | [Y]US4065094 (ADAMS TED); | [A]US7100489 (KENDALL DONALD H [US]); | [A]US5786542 (PETROVICH PAUL A [US], et al); | [A]WO2007027217 (HUMANISTIC ROBOTICS INC [US], et al) |