EP2202330 - ORNAMENT PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYAKAWA, Maki c/o CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO. LTD. 1-12 Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | 02 /
MURATA, Yasushi c/o CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO. LTD. 1-12 Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08832666.5 | 18.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008JP66890 | Priority number, date | JP20070242346 | 19.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007242346 | [2010/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009038151 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202330 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/16, A44C27/00, C23C14/06, C22C5/02 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
C23C14/0664 (EP,US);
A44C27/006 (EP,US);
C22C5/02 (EP,US);
C23C14/0015 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1093 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12576 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | ZIERTEILE | [2010/26] | English: | ORNAMENT PARTS | [2010/26] | French: | ELÉMENTS DÉCORATIFS | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | Translation filed | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2000812 (NISHIDA N) [AD] 1-15 * page 1; claim 5 *; | [A]GB2162864 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1-15* page 1, line 39 - line 61 *; | [X]US2004093730 (MIYA YUKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples B6, C6 * | International search | [X]JPS6184392 (IWASAKI MEKKI KK); | [A]JPS6353267 (NIPPON DENTO KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2003013282 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]JP2003183851 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2003253473 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS541979 | JPH02942 | JP2006249510 |