EP2198355 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SENSOR GEOMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maritime Robotics As Brattörkaia 11 Pirterminalen 7010 Trondheim / NO | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOVSTEIN, Vegard Evjen Nedre Möllenberg gate 34 7014 Trondheim / NO | [2013/15] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
HOVSTEIN, Vegard Evjen Nedre Möllenberg gate 34 N-7014 Trondheim / NO | Representative(s) | Curo AS Vestre Rosten 81 7075 Tiller / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Curo AS Industriveien 53 7080 Heimdal / NO | ||
Former [2010/25] | Curo AS Industriveien 53 7080 Heimdal / NO | Application number, filing date | 08832767.1 | 29.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008NO00346 | Priority number, date | NO20070004975 | 03.10.2007 Original published format: NO 20074975 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009045109 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2198355 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2198355 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/10, G05D1/02, G01S5/14, G01V1/38 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
G01V1/3826 (EP,US);
G01V1/3808 (US);
G01S15/89 (US);
G05D1/0206 (EP,US);
G05D1/0293 (EP,US);
G05D1/104 (EP,US);
G01C13/008 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | G05D1/02, G01S5/14, G01V1/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR SENSORGEOMETRIE | [2010/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SENSOR GEOMETRY | [2010/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR GÉOMÉTRIE DE CAPTEUR | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 06.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2008 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | HR | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | IE | 29.09.2013 | LU | 29.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | NO | 10.10.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 29.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 29.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 29.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5043903 (CONSTANT CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [I] 1-18; | [IY]US5810297 (BASUTHAKUR SIBNATH [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * the whole document * [Y] 1-18; | [Y]US2003208320 (ZAJAC MARK [US]) [Y] 1-18* the whole document *; | [Y]US2006235584 (FREGENE KINGSLEY O [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] * * claim 1 * | International search | [A]US5043903 (CONSTANT CLAUDE [FR]); | [A]US5810297 (BASUTHAKUR SIBNATH [US], et al); | [X]US2003208320 (ZAJAC MARK [US]) | by applicant | US2003208320 | US2006235584 |