EP2203149 - FLUIDIZED SLURRY OF WATER SOLUBLE AND OR WATER-SWELLABLE POLYMER AND MIXTURE THEREOF (FPS) FOR USE IN DENTIFRICE AND HOUSEHOLD APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hercules Incorporated Hercules Plaza 1313 N. Market Street Wilmington, DE 19894-0001 / US | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MODI, Jashawant, J. 54 Raphael Drive Hockessin DE 19707 / US | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Patentanwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08833229.1 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US11155 | Priority number, date | US20070995519P | 27.09.2007 Original published format: US 995519 P | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009042197 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2203149 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/25, A61K8/34, A61K8/73, A61K8/81, A61Q11/00, C11D3/37 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
C11D3/3765 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61K8/733 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
C11D17/0013 (EP,US);
C11D3/1246 (EP,US);
C11D3/2041 (EP,US);
C11D3/2065 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
C11D3/225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGSCHLAMM VON IN WASSER LÖSLICHEM UND/ODER IN WASSER QUELLBAREM POLYMER UND MISCHUNG DAMIT (FPS) ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI ZAHNREINIGUNGS- UND HAUSHALTSGERÄTEN | [2010/27] | English: | FLUIDIZED SLURRY OF WATER SOLUBLE AND OR WATER-SWELLABLE POLYMER AND MIXTURE THEREOF (FPS) FOR USE IN DENTIFRICE AND HOUSEHOLD APPLICATIONS | [2010/27] | French: | BOUILLIE FLUIDISÉE DE POLYMÈRE SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU ET/OU GONFLABLE PAR L'EAU ET MÉLANGE DE CEUX-CI (FPS) POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS DES APPLICATIONS DE DENTIFRICE ET DES APPLICATIONS MÉNAGÈRES | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.07.2013 | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/41] | 27.05.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 12.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4485089 (LEIPOLD DIANNE P [US]) [X] 1-32 * examples 1-7 ** claims 1,3 *; | [X]US5071638 (YOSHIE MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-32 * examples 2-6,8-10 * * claim 1 * * column 3, lines 33-66 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 27 *; | [X]US5094843 (MAZZANOBILE SALVATORE [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * example 1 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 29 *; | [X]EP0696449 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-32 * examples 1-3 *; | [DY]US5932193 (LOPEZ JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al) [DY] 1-32 * claim - * * example - *; | [X]US6342205 (NIEMI TAINA H [FI], et al) [X] 1-32 * claim 1 * * column 5, lines 55-63 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 39 * * column 3, lines 49-56 *; | [XY]WO2006028578 (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1-32 * claims 1,18-24,35,58,59 * * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 3, lines 14-20 * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 14 * * page 7, lines 10-23 * [Y] 1-32 |