EP2190814 - N-HYDROXYLSULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS NEW PHYSIOLOGICALLY USEFUL NITROXYL DONORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 N. Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | For all designated states Cardioxyl Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1450 Raleigh Rd., Suite 212 Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US | [2017/04] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Johns Hopkins University 3400 N. Charles St. Baltimore MD 21218 / US | ||
For all designated states Cardioxyl Pharmaceuticals, INC. Executive Plaza ll 11350 McCormick Road Hunt Valley, Maryland 21031 / US | |||
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University Johns Hopkins Technology Transfer 100 N. Charles Street 5th Floor Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | ||
For all designated states Cardioxyl Pharmaceuticals, INC. Executive Plaza ll 11350 McCormick Road Hunt Valley, Maryland 21031 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOSCANO, John, P. 18 Tree FarmCourt Glen Arm MD 21057 / US | 02 /
BROOKFIELD, Frederick, Arthur 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | 03 /
COHEN, Andrew, D. Apt. 28A, 345 East 80th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 04 /
COURTNEY, Stephen, Martin 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | 05 /
FROST, Lisa, Marie 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | 06 /
KALISH, Vincent, Jacob 344 Dubois Road Annapolis MD 21401 / US | [2017/05] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
TOSCANO, John, P. 18 Tree FarmCourt Glen Arm MD 21057 / US | ||
02 /
BROOKFIELD, Frederick, Arthur 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | |||
03 /
COHEN, Andrew, D. Apt. 28A, 345 East 80th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | |||
04 /
COURTNEY, Stephen, Martin 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | |||
05 /
FROST, Lisa, Marie 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | |||
06 /
KALISH, Vincent, Jacob 344 Dubois Road Annapolis MD 21401 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Wright, Simon Mark J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Wright, Simon Mark J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08834117.7 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008US78024 | Priority number, date | US20070995636P | 26.09.2007 Original published format: US 995636 P | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009042970 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190814 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2190814 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/48, C07D295/155, C07D295/192, C07D295/16, C07D295/26, C07D333/36, C07D333/38, A61K31/18, A61K31/192, A61K31/235, A61K31/5377, A61P9/04, A61P9/10 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
C07C311/48 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,CN,US);
C07C317/48 (US);
A61K31/18 (KR);
A61K31/192 (KR);
A61K31/235 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D295/155 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/16 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/192 (EP,US);
C07D295/26 (EP,US);
C07D333/26 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/34 (KR);
C07D333/36 (EP,US);
C07D333/44 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | C07C311/48, C07D333/34, C07D295/192, A61K31/18, A61K31/192, A61K31/235, A61K31/5377, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, C07D333/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/05] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | N-HYDROXYLSULFONAMIDDERIVATE ALS NEUE PHYSIOLOGISCH NÜTZLICHE NITROXYL-SPENDER | [2010/22] | English: | N-HYDROXYLSULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS NEW PHYSIOLOGICALLY USEFUL NITROXYL DONORS | [2010/22] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE N-HYDROXYLSULFONAMIDE UTILISÉS COMME NOUVEAUX DONNEURS DE NITROXYLE PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT UTILES | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 02.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2008 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | IT | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | NL | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | IE | 26.09.2017 | LU | 26.09.2017 | MT | 26.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.09.2008 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 26.09.2017 | ||
LU | 26.09.2017 | ||
MT | 26.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.09.2008 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 26.09.2017 | ||
LU | 26.09.2017 | ||
MT | 26.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 26.09.2017 | ||
LU | 26.09.2017 | ||
MT | 26.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 26.09.2017 | ||
LU | 26.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 26.09.2017 | ||
LU | 26.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | JP2002072459 [ ] (TOYO GOSEI KOGYO KK); | [DA]US2004038947 (WINK DAVID A [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * paragraph [0050]; claim 1 *; | [DA]US6936639 (WINK DAVID A [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * column 4, lines 29-21; claims 1,8,12,13 *; | [X] - H.T. NAGASAWA, ET AL., "Prodrugs of nitroxyl as potential aldehyde dehydrogenase inhibitors vis-à-vis vascular smooth muscle relaxants", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199505), vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1865 - 1871, XP002214380 [X] 1,2,4-7 * compounds 7b, 9-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00011a005 | [X] - C.H. ANDREWS, ET AL., "Experimental chemotherapy of typhus. Anti-rickettsial action of p-sulphamylbenzamidine and related compounds", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF LONDON, SERIES B, BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, THE ROYAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (19460110), vol. 133, no. 1, ISSN 0080-4649, pages 20 - 62, XP002100404 [X] 1,2,4,7 * page 55, lines 36-40 * | [X] - CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2037996565, URL: STN, XP002509259 [X] 1,4,6,7 * Order no. ken-168921 * | [PX] - Aurora Screening Library, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, AURORA FINE CHEMICALS, (20080613) [PX] 1,4,6,7 | [L] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20070213), Database accession no. 920663-30-5, URL: STN, XP002509260 | [X] - CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2033715491, URL: STN, XP002509261 [X] 1,4,6,7 * Order no. T5685187 * | [PX] - Enamine Screening Library, KIEV, UA, ENAMINE, (20080117) [PX] 1,4,6,7 | [L] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20070413), Database accession no. 930060-37-7, URL: STN, XP002509262 | [X] - CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2033522701, URL: STN, XP002509263 [X] 1,4,6,7 * Order no. EN300-11181 * | [PX] - Enamine Building Blocks, KIEV, UA, ENAMINE, (20080117) [PX] 1,4,6,7 | [L] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20041130), Database accession no. 790725-76-7, URL: STN, XP002509264 | [DX] - A. SCOZZAFAVA, ET AL., "Carbonic Anhydrase and matrix metalloproteinase inhibitors: sulphonylated amino acid hydroxamates with MMP inhibitory properties act as efficient inhibitors of CA isozymes I, II, and IV, and N-hydroxysulphonamides inhibit both these zinc enzymes", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20000913), vol. 43, no. 20, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3677 - 3687, XP002394373 [DX] 1,2,4-7 * compound 70 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm000027t | [X] - A. SCOZZAFAVA, ET AL., "Carbonic Anhydrase and matrix metalloproteinase inhibitors: sulphonylated amino acid hydroxamates with MMP inhibitory properties act as efficient inhibitors of CA isozymes I, II, and IV, and N-hydroxysulphonamides inhibit both these zinc enzymes", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010308), vol. 44, no. 6, ISSN 0022-2623, page 1016, XP002445147 [X] 1,2,4-7 * compounds 71-73 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0004852 | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:176265, URL: STN, XP002509265 [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * | Examination | JPH04321671 | WO2007109175 | by applicant | - MA ET AL., "Opposite effects of nitric oxide and nitroxyl on postischemic myocardial injury", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 14617 - 14622, XP002404165 |