EP2196208 - PLANT EXTRACT AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo-to 144-8721 / JP | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYOHARA, Yoshikazu c/o TAKASAGO INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION Corporate Research & Development Division 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0073 / JP | 02 /
HIRAMOTO, Tadahiro c/o TAKASAGO INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION Corporate Research & Development Division 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0073 / JP | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Fédit-Loriot 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08834664.8 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008JP67528 | Priority number, date | JP20070249759 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007249759 | [2010/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009041640 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196208 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/18, A61K8/368, A61K8/97, A61K31/191, A61P39/06, A61Q11/00, A61Q13/00, A61Q15/00, A61Q17/00, C07C67/56, C07C69/732, C09K15/08 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
C07C69/732 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K31/191 (EP,US);
A61K36/74 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61L9/013 (EP,US);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
C07C67/56 (EP,US);
C09K15/08 (EP,US);
C11D3/0068 (US);
C11D3/382 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A61K2236/30 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/56, C07C69/732 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/2108 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | PFLANZENEXTRAKT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2010/24] | English: | PLANT EXTRACT AND USE THEREOF | [2010/24] | French: | EXTRAIT VÉGÉTAL ET SON UTILISATION | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2010 | Translation filed | 25.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 03.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MOREIRA DANIEL P ET AL, "Contribution of chlorogenic acids to the iron-reducing activity of coffee beverages", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (200503), vol. 53, no. 5, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1399 - 1402,1393, XP002595486 [X] 1-11 * tables 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf0485436 | [I] - STALMACH ANGELIQUE ET AL, "On-line HPLC analysis of the antioxidant activity of phenolic compounds in brewed, paper-filtered coffee", BRAZILIAN JOURNAL OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (200601), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 1677-0420, pages 253 - 261, XP002595487 [I] 1-11 * tables 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/S1677-04202006000100018 | [A] - NEGISHI OSAMU ET AL, "Deodorization with ku-ding-cha containing a large amount of caffeoyl quinic acid derivatives", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20040825), vol. 52, no. 17, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 5513 - 5518, XP002595488 [A] 6,8,9 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf049693j | International search | [X]JP2006342145 (ORIZA YUKA KK); | [Y]JP2007181406 (ITO EN LTD); | [Y]JPH09143465 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPS63502434 (ERGO FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH) | [Y] - IWAI, KAZUYA ET AL., "In vitro antioxidative effects and tyrosinase inhibitory activities of seven hydroxycinnamoyl derivatives in green coffee beans", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, vol. 52, no. 15, pages 4893 - 4898, XP003006730 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf040048m | by applicant | JP2006102477 | JP2003306417 | JP2006116433 | JPS5318772 | JPH04145049 | JPS5191368 | JP2006306799 | - MOREIRA DANIEL P ET AL., "Contribution of chlorogenic acids to the iron-reducing activity of coffee beverages", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20050305), vol. 53, pages 1399 - 1402 | - IWAI, KAZUYA ET AL., "In vitro antioxidative effects and tyrosinase inhibitory activities of seven hydroxycinnamoyl derivatives in green coffee beans", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, vol. 52, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1021/jf040048m, pages 4893 - 4898, XP003006730 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf040048m |