EP2201526 - ALTERING THE APPEARANCE OF A DIGITAL IMAGE USING A SHAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATFIELD, Larry T. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
DOUGLAS, Scott H. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ROHRING, Nicholas W. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
KOTLER, Matthew J. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
GEFFNER, Steven P. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
WALTMAN, David Wayne c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
ZHART, Auston Warner c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
MAI, Zhao Hong c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2013/49] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
HATFIELD, Larry T. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
DOUGLAS, Scott H. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
ROHRING, Nicholas W. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
04 /
KOTLER, Matthew J. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
05 /
GEFFNER, Steven P. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
06 /
WALTMAN, David Wayne c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
07 /
ZHART, Auston Warner c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
08 /
MAI, Zhao Hong c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08834669.7 | 27.08.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008US74519 | Priority number, date | US20070859868 | 24.09.2007 Original published format: US 859868 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009042336 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201526 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201526 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/60, G06F17/24, G06F17/00, G06T11/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | VERÄNDERUNG DES AUSSEHENS EINES DIGITALBILDES UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER FORM | [2010/26] | English: | ALTERING THE APPEARANCE OF A DIGITAL IMAGE USING A SHAPE | [2010/26] | French: | MODIFICATION DE L'APPARENCE D'UNE IMAGE NUMÉRIQUE À L'AIDE D'UNE FORME | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2008 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | HR | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | NO | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | LU | 27.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
NO | 04.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6333752 (HASEGAWA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 22-41 *; | [XY]US6973222 (HAEBERLI PAUL [US]) [X] 1-4,7,11 * figure 9 * * column 1, line 10 - line 15 * * column 14, line 25 - line 30 * * column 13, line 65 - column 14, line 24 * * column 14, line 57 - line 67 * * column 15, line 4 - line 16 * * column 4, line 9 - line 27 * [Y] 5,6,8-10,12-15; | [A]US2006129944 (BERQUIST DAVID T [US], et al) [A] 12,14 * paragraph [0085] * * figures 43-53 *; | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Adobe Photoshop 6.0 User Guide, page 1,2,9-35,91-106", INTERNET CITATION, (20000101), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://kfrserver.natur.cuni.cz/obecne/soubory/PhotoShop6/UserGuide.pdf, (20110824), XP002657457 [Y] 5,6,8-10,12-15 * pages 19,21 * | International search | [A]US5777626 (TAKASHIMA AKIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US6128013 (PRABHU GIRISH V [US], et al); | [X]US6973222 (HAEBERLI PAUL [US]); | [A]WO2006022768 (MICROSOFT CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | US6973222 |